Dell Inc. et al v. Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sam Sparks |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-00393 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 05, 2015 1:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Philips & Lite-on Digital Solutions Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation Korea
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sony Optiarc Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sony Optiarc America Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sony Electronics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sony Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NEC Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan
|
|
Defendant
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hitachi-LG Data Storage Korea, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hitachi, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
BenQ Corporation
|
|
Defendant
BenQ America Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Dell Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dell Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Dell drops lawsuit against Hitachi alleging it had been part of a price-fixing conspiracy (theregister.co.uk) |
Submitted Mon 06/26/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2013 | ||
19 | 19 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in ND/CA District as case number 3:13-cv-3350. (klw) | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2013 | ||
18 | 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) to the ND/CA. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel.(klw) | |
Thursday, May 23, 2013 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Michael Kenny to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) | |
16 | 16 ORDER GRANTING11 Motion for Elizabeth Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) | |
15 | 15 ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Rodney J. Ganske to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) | |
14 | 14 ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Debra Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) | |
13 | 13 ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Andrew Tuck to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) | |
Tuesday, May 21, 2013 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon G. Shepherd of Michael P. Kenny ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5541058) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon G. Shepherd of Elizabeth Jordan ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5541012) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon G. Shepherd Rodney J. Ganske ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5540980) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon G. Shepherd of Debra D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5540924) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon G. Shepherd of Andrew Tuck ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5540821) by on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 14, 2013 | ||
7 | 7 Letters to Andrew J. Tuck, Debra D. Bernstein, Michael P. Kenny and Rodney J. Ganske re: non-admitted status. (os) | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (os) | |
Monday, May 13, 2013 | ||
5 | 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. Against Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Shepherd, Jon) | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to BenQ America Corporation, BenQ Corporation, Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi-LG Data Storage Korea, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan, NEC Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips & Lite-on Digital Solutions Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation Korea. (os) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Shepherd, Jon) | |
2 | 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. Against All Defendants (Shepherd, Jon) | |
1 | 1 55 pgs COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-5515862), filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc..(Shepherd, Jon) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (os) | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (os) |