Sanya v. United States Secret Service
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Peter J Messitte |
Case #: | 8:13-cv-01429 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | Motion for Return of Property |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 05, 2015 12:54 AM EST |
Defendant
United States Secret Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mojisola Adedolapo Sanya
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 25 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 09/24/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |