KENNEDY et al v. ARAMARK HOLDINGS CORPORATION et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nitza I Quinones Alejandro |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-02678 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 10:18 PM EST |
Cross Claimant
"DENISE"
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
"MAKEBBA"
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
"ROB"
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
"TINETTA"
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
ARAMARK CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
ARAMARK HOLDINGS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
WALTER FLAHERTY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
DR. EKE KALU
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
VERONICA LEMON
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
HELEN SARSKAYA, PA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
MARY SILVA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
"DENISE"
|
|
Cross Defendant
"MAKEBBA"
|
|
Cross Defendant
"ROB"
|
|
Cross Defendant
"TINETTA"
|
|
Cross Defendant
FREDERICK ABELLOS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
JOHN P. DELANEY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
WALTER FLAHERTY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CLYDE D. GAINEY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
LOUIS GIORLA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
DR. BRUCE HERDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
DR. EKE KALU
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
VERONICA LEMON
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
GERALD MAY
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
HELEN SARSKAYA, PA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
MARY SILVA
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
DAVID TURNER
|
|
Defendant
"DENISE"
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
"MAKEBBA"
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
"ROB"
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
"TINETTA"
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FREDERICK ABELLOS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BALMORE
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BARKSDALE
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRADLEY
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BROWN
|
|
Defendant
CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL ELIZABETH HENRY
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BENTLY
|
|
Defendant
JOHN P. DELANEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WALTER FLAHERTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CLYDE D. GAINEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOUIS GIORLA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GLOVER
|
|
Defendant
DR. BRUCE HERDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANE AND JOHN DOES-ARAMARK EMPLOYEES
|
|
Defendant
JANE AND JOHN DOES-PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JAY
|
|
Defendant
DR. EKE KALU
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VERONICA LEMON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER LESLIE
|
|
Defendant
GERALD MAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM
|
|
Defendant
HELEN SARSKAYA, PA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARY SILVA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER STILES
|
|
Defendant
DAVID TURNER
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER WILSON
|
|
Plaintiff
CHAL D. KENNEDY, SR.
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
SUPERVISOR "DENISE"
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
SUPERVISOR "MAKEBBA"
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHLADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
SUPERVISOR "ROB"
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
SUPERVISOR "TINETTA"
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
DEPUTY WARDEN FREDERICK ABELLOS
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
C/O BALMORE
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
CORRECTIONAL OFFICRE BARKSDALE
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRADLEY
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
WARDEN OF C.F.C.F. JOHN P. DELANEY
PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM 7901 STATE ROAD
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
GENERAL MANAGER WALTER FLAHERTY
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
DEPUTY WARDEN CLYDE D. GAINEY
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
COMMISSIONER LOUIS GIORLA
PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM 7901 STATE ROAD
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GLOVER
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
DR. BRUCE HERDMAN
PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM 7901 STATE ROAD
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
C/O JAY
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
SUPERVISOR VERONICA LEMON
ARAMARK 1101 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107 |
|
Unrepresented Party
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER LESLIE
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
Unrepresented Party
DEPUTY WARDEN GERALD MAY
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19136 |
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
VICE PRESIDENT MARY SILVA
CORIZON HEALTH, INC. 108 WESTPARK DRIVE SUITE 200
BRENTWOOD, TN 37027 |
|
Unrepresented Party
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER STILES
7901 STATE ROAD
PHILA, PA 19136 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
"DAVE"
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JANE DOE" - ARAMARK EMPLOYEES
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JANE DOES" - CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JANE DOES" - PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JOHN DOES" - ARAMARK EMPLOYEES
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JOHN DOES" - CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
"JOHN DOES" - PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEM
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ANDERSON
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
ARAMARK CORPORATION
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SERVICES, INC.
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARAMARK HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BARNETT
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BENTLEY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER BRANCH
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER CARTER
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CFCF D-1 HOUSING UNIT MANAGEMENT TEAM
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER DEAN
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
DEPUTY WARDEN FOR ADMINISTRATION
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GAINEY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GRAHAM
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
HELEN
Terminated: 09/17/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANE AND JOHN DOES-CORIZON HEALTH INC.
Terminated: 09/17/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER KENNEDY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER LEE
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER LEFTWICH
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
BARBARA MCKENNEDY-ADAMS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MILTON
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MOORE
Terminated: 01/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER PERRY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
ROSS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ROSS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER SMITH
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER THOMAS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER WHITTAKER
Terminated: 01/28/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER WILLIAMS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM ALLEN
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN BENJAMIN
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLEVIS BURRIS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES CLARK
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH COLLINS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARNELL CUNNINGHAM
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS DANIELS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WARREN EVANS
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCELLO FOY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EVAN JORDAN
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN KENNEDY
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUIS LOPEZ
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WALTER PERSON
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAHEEM PLEASANT
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEROME POLISON
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EARL REEDMAN
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONALD SMITH
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JIMMY THOMPSON
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOAN VASQUEZ
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LARCELL WAGSTAFF
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW WEBB
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID WOODWARD
Terminated: 06/12/2013
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
134 | 134
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Fri 04/24 12:13 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/24/2015. 4/24/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
133 | 133
15
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Fri 04/24 12:08 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/24/2015. 4/24/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
132 | 132
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/17 11:19 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A 7-DAY EXTENSION OF THE PERIOD OF TIME TO RESPOND IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO.131 ) IS DENIED. SEE ORDER DATED 4/8/2015 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/17/2015.4/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
131 | 131
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/17 7:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to108 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,104 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,109 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,105 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,114 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,113 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHAL D. KENNEDY, SR.Certificate of Service.(SEAY, GEOFFREY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |