River Light V, L.P. et al v. Wona Trading, Inc et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-03667 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 3:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Wona Trading, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ja Sook Yang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
River Light V, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tory Burch LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Grace Thun
Terminated: 03/06/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/09/2013 11:11 AM EDT |