Kentucky USA Energy, Inc
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:10-bk-11424
Lead case is: 1:10-bk-11424
Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joan A Lloyd |
Case #: | 1:10-bk-11532 |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2010 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 05, 2010 |
Dismissed: | Jul 23, 2012 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2012 |
Debtor
Kentucky USA Energy, Inc
321 Somerset Road, Suite 1
London, KY 40741 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
US Trustee
Joseph J. Golden
Office of the U.S. Trustee 601 W. Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202 |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2013 4:08 PM EST |
Sunday, October 03, 2010 | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition 10-11532 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt number 4530267. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039. Filed by Kentucky USA Energy, Inc. Remaining Petition Due by 10/18/2010. This case may be dismissed without further notice if the schedules are not filed timely. (Bachert, Scott) |