|
GPO
Jul 29 2013
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Charles J. Lo Grande shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.00 by August 19, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/19/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed)(MKR)
|
|
GPO
Aug 23 2013
stitution. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/20/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to waive his filing fee 9 is denied. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time in which to pay his $14.00 initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.00 by September 20, 2013. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by this date, plaintiff's case will be dismissed. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's in
|
|
GPO
Oct 01 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION - The September 20, 2013, deadline has passed and plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee in this matter. Therefore, plaintiff's case will be dismissed for failing to comply with the Court's orders. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|