Sterling International Inc v. Sorensen Research and Development Trust
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-01415 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2013 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 03, 2015 8:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Sorensen Research And Development Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sterling International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2013 10:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 08, 2013 | ||
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust. Case assigned to Judge Audrey B. Collins for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc.(et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
2 | 2 FED.R.CIV.P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. Related Case(s): CV 11-3720 GW. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
4 | 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sterling International Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
6 | 6 APPLICATION of non-resident for attorney JAMES W. ANABLE to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
7 | 7 APPLICATION of non-resident for attorney JOHN D. DENKENBERGER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Friday, February 15, 2013 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 11-03720 GW(JEMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge Audrey B. Collins to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-00938 GW(JEMx).Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
9 | 9 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials BeforeJudge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Thursday, February 21, 2013 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John D. Denkenberger on behalf of Plaintiff Sterling International, Inc., designating Scott C. Moore as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
11 | 11 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney james W. Anable on behalf of Plaintiff Sterling International, Inc., designating Scott C. Moore as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Thursday, March 21, 2013 | ||
12 | 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Sterling International Inc. upon Sorensen Research and Development Trust waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/12/2013, answer due 5/11/2013. Waiver of Service signed by Patricia A. Shackelford on behalf of Sorensen Research and Development Trust. (Anable, James) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2013 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott C Moore counsel for Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. Changing address to 707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 6000, Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543. Filed by Plaintiff Sterling International, Inc. (Moore, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Monday, May 13, 2013 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Transfer filed by Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.(Shackelford, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Jens Erik Sorensen, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Chris Kuczynski, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15 DECLARATION of Patricia A. Shackelford In Support of Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Case or Transfer 14 filed by Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust.(Shackelford, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, May 17, 2013 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE Notice of Errata filed by Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust. (Shackelford, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
17 | 17 DECLARATION of Jens Erik Sorensen In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer MOTION to Dismiss Case or Transfer 14 filed by Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust. (Shackelford, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Thursday, May 23, 2013 | ||
18 | 18 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case or Transfer 14 filed by Plaintiff Sterling International Inc. (McMahon, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Thursday, May 30, 2013 | ||
19 | 19 REPLY Reply MOTION to Dismiss Case or Transfer 14 filed by Defendant Sorensen Research and Development Trust.(Shackelford, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Christian Fenton, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 | ||
Thursday, June 13, 2013 | ||
20 | 20 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT SORENSEN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS.OR TRANSFER (filed 05/13/13)14 ; Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. The (Court DENIES Defendant's motion to dismiss based on improper venue, but GRANTS Defendant's request to transfer the case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California;Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Letter 22) (pj) [Transferred from California Central on 6/17/2013.] (Entered: 06/17/2013) | |
Monday, June 17, 2013 | ||
Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal assigned to transfer case from Central District of CA. (no document attached) (kaj) | ||
21 | 21 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:13-cv-00938. Original file received electronically (kaj)(av1). |