Bristol-Gonzalgo v. United States of America
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:12-cv-02043 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2012 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2016 7:51 PM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Jean Bristol-Gonzalgo
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
United States Department of the Navy
Terminated: 04/22/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Vargas
Terminated: 06/21/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raul Vargas
Terminated: 06/21/2013
|
Represented By
|