Brian Humphreys v. McCabe Weisberg & Conway, et al
Original Case: 5:15-cv-04355
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03270 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 14, 2017 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MCCABE WEISBERG CONWAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RAYMOND MAJCZAN, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MCCABE WEISBERG CONWAY, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN C. HUMPHREYS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/14/2017 4:36 AM EDT |
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Brian Humphreys in District Court No. 5-15-cv-04355. (TMM) |