Monster T-Shirts LLC v. F&M Expressions Consultants Inc
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary G Lewis |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-02205 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 6:32 AM EST |
Defendant
F & M Expressions Unlimited, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monster T-Shirts LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
F&M Expressions Consultants Inc
Terminated: 03/26/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/17/2013 11:35 PM EDT |