Sharp et al v. Covington Police Chief Richard Palmisano et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Ann Vial Lemmon |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-05429 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 01, 2015 1:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Sharp Global Energy Services, LLC 77581
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A. Sharp, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samurai Exploration and Production Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Marie Lerma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lysett Rene Lerma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Lerma
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jared Caruso Riecke
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Resource Bank
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walter Reed
Terminated: 11/08/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Palmisano
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Palmisano
Terminated: 09/17/2014
1129 North Sibley Street
Metairie, LA 70003 |
|
Defendant
Peter A. Garcia
Terminated: 11/08/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GDH, Inc.
Terminated: 07/24/2014
|
|
Defendant
GDH International Iraq, Inc.
Terminated: 06/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GDH International Inc.
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Covington Police Department
Terminated: 06/19/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Covington City
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Bank and Trust Company, Inc.
Terminated: 12/30/2013
|
Represented By
|