District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:13-cv-01266
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2013
Terminated:Sep 10, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 5:19 AM EST
Defendant
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By
John G. Interrante
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Bradford Mann Berry
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of Col
contact info
Michelle Lo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
AYUDA, INC.
Represented By
David Alan Zetoony
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Joshua James
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHOLIC CHARITIES OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF WASHINGTON DC
Represented By
David Alan Zetoony
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Joshua James
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHOLIC LEGAL IMMIGRATION NETWORK, INC.
Represented By
David Alan Zetoony
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Joshua James
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By
David Alan Zetoony
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Joshua James
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info

Docket as of: Wednesday Aug 21, 2013 11:27 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 20, 2013
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3438716) filed by LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER, AYUDA, INC., CATHOLIC LEGAL IMMIGRATION NETWORK, INC., CATHOLIC CHARITIES OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF WASHINGTON DC.(James, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons US Attorney General,
Att: 6 Summons US Attorney of DC,
Att: 7 Summons Federal Trade Commission
2 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(sth, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons