National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al v. Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Referred: | Lurana S Snow |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-61852 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 30, 2017 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.
1125 Alfred I. Dupont Blvd.
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abraham condarco-palaez, MD
|
|
Defendant
janet dawson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
earl Clarence mills, MD
|
|
Plaintiff
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/06 12:38 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Notice DE27 is APPROVED; This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Clerk shall CLOSE this case and DENY all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/6/2017. (jas) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/06 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Earl Clarence Mills, MD and Abraham Condarco-Palaez, MD by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Status Report Order
Thu 12/29 4:19 PM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT FROM PLAINTIFFS. On or before January 5, 2017, Plaintiffs National Fire and Medical Protective shall file a status report as to this case. (Status Report due by 1/5/2017). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/29/2016. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 11/30 11:03 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Dismiss. Count I of the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Dawson. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/29/2016. (jas) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 11/29 4:07 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re23 Order to Show Cause by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 11/23 10:35 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/29/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/22/2016. (jas) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/03 10:47 AM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by janet dawson. Attorney Jonathan Gdanski added to party janet dawson(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/21/2016(Gdanski, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 11/03 9:55 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana. janet dawson served on 9/28/2016, answer due 10/19/2016. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 11/02 3:27 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2016. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/2/2016. (jas) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 10/28 2:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING PALM SPRINGS GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS re12 Motion to Dismiss. Count I of the Complaint DE1 is hereby DISMISSED as to Defendant Palm Springs. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/28/2016. (mc) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 10/13 8:36 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana. Abraham condarco-palaez, MD served on 9/24/2016, answer due 10/17/2016. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Wed 10/12 11:19 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Earl Clarence Mills, MD - Motions Terminated:16 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/12/2016. (lk) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 10/11 12:12 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to earl Clarence mills, MD by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana.(Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 09/30 12:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, filed by Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.. (Marino, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/23 3:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/3/2016. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/07 2:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (Marino, Stephen) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 09/07 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Stuart Hearn on behalf of Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.. Attorney Anthony Stuart Hearn added to party Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft). (Hearn, Anthony) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 09/07 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danya Pincavage on behalf of Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.. Attorney Danya Pincavage added to party Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft). (Pincavage, Danya) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 09/07 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen A. Marino, Jr on behalf of Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.. Attorney Stephen A. Marino, Jr added to party Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft). (Marino, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 08/31 11:20 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana. Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc. served on 8/19/2016, answer due 9/9/2016. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 08/24 12:33 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana. earl Clarence mills, MD served on 8/23/2016, answer due 9/13/2016. (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/16 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc., Abraham condarco-palaez, MD, janet dawson, earl Clarence mills, MD. (asl) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 08/16 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana (Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) | ||
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 08/04 4:34 PM
ORDER Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report, amd Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/4/2016. (jas) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Wed 08/03 6:13 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Wed 08/03 6:12 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (srd) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/03 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Palm Springs General Hospital, Inc., Abraham condarco-palaez, MD, janet dawson, earl Clarence mills, MD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8970984, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, The Medical Protective Company of Fort Wayne, Indiana.(Kiernan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |