Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:16-cv-01227
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2016
Terminated:Oct 04, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 31, 2017 1:27 AM PST
Defendant
CSGOLotto
Defendant
CSGOShuffle
Defendant
Thomas Cassell
Defendant
CSGOLotto Inc
Represented By
Coleman Watson
Watson LLP
contact info
Ada Ko Wong
Akw Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Trevor A. Martin
Represented By
Coleman Watson
Watson LLP
contact info
Ada Ko Wong
Akw Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
OPSkins Group, Inc.
Defendant
PhantomL0rd, Inc.
Represented By
Paul E Fogarty
Fogarty Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Valve Corporation
Represented By
Gavin William Skok
Riddell Williams
contact info
James Harlan Wendell
Riddell Williams
contact info
Shata L. Stucky
Riddell Williams
contact info
Charles B Casper
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Defendant
James Varga
Represented By
Paul E Fogarty
Fogarty Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
AD
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
AL
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominic Allen
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Alphin
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Dakota Barney
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Bohl
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Calvi
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Chandler
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Cianfaglione
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Jared Conley
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Crain
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradford Daniels
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Ford
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
GG
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
GL
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
GM
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Mitchell Gunter
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
A.D.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Hallman
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
A.L.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Allphin
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
JJ
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
C. B.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Joines
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
KM
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kamenkovich
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Sam Keller
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
C. D.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kim
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Durbin
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Klimt
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Ecker
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
LL
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
G.G.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
LO
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
G.L.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan Latvis
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
G.M.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Levi Ledbetter
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
William Garvin
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Isaac Lynn
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
J.J.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Rahul Malhotra
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
K.M.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
L.L.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael John McLeod
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
L.O.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Mora
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
N.M.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
NM
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
P.L.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
P.S.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
PL
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
PS
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayme Reed
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
B. S.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Phillips
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
S.S.
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Punzak
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Skyler Schuman
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Ryan
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
SS
Represented By
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Spann
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Williard
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Woelper
Represented By
Paul C. Whalen
Law Office Of Paul C. Whalen, P.C.
contact info
Jasper D. Ward, IV
Jones Ward PLC
contact info
Kim D Stephens
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info
Jason T Dennett
Tousley Brain Stephens
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
48 48 order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Tue 10:49 AM
ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour denying Defendants CSGO Lotto Inc. and Trevor A. Martin's41 Motion for Attorney Fees. (PM)
Related: [-]
47 47 order Judgment by Court Tue 10:48 AM
AMENDED JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Court dismissed Plaintiffs' RICO claim with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The remaining state law claims are also dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (PM)
Related: [-]
46 46 order 1 - Order Tue 10:46 AM
AMNEDED ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendants CSGO Lotto, Inc. and Trevor A. Martin's19 MOTION to dismiss. Defendant Valve Corporation's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No.21 ) is denied as moot. (PM)
Related: [-]
45 45 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10:41 AM
ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiffs'40 Motion to alter, vacate, or amend the judgment. The Court's order on the motion to dismiss and judgment shall be amended to dismiss the state law claims without prejudice. (PM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 9:18 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin, TO RESPONSE to41 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
43 43 respm Response to Motion Mon 11:38 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to41 MOTION for Attorney Fees .(Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Fees
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
42 42 respm Declaration Tue 12:29 PM
DECLARATION of Coleman W. Watson, Esq. filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re41 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Attorney Fees Tue 12:26 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. Noting Date 11/4/2016, (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, October 10, 2016
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 2:40 PM
MOTION to Alter, Vacate or Amend Judgment Dismissing Claims with Prejudice re39 Judgment by Court,38 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Compel, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper. Noting Date 10/28/2016, (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
39 39 order Judgment by Court Tue 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Court dismissed Plaintiffs' RICO claim with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The remaining state law claims are also dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (PM)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Compel Tue 1:31 PM
ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendants CSGO Lotto and Trevor A. Martin's19 Motion to Dismiss. The first amended complaint11 is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Defendant Valve Corporation's21 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. (PM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
37 37 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re36 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Valve Corporation (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 3:27 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Valve Corporation, TO RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Declaration Fri 12:45 PM
DECLARATION of Trevor A. Martin (Supplemental) filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration Fri 12:44 PM
DECLARATION of Aaron Vick (Supplemental) filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12:43 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin, TO RESPONSE to19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
32 32 respm Response to Motion Mon 4:01 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Oral Argument Requested.(Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
31 31 respm Response to Motion Mon 3:18 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint . Oral Argument Requested. (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave Fri 12:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's unopposed25 Motion for leave to file an over-length brief re motion to dismiss and granting Plaintiff's27 Motion for leave to file an over-length brief re motion to compel arbitration. (PM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re Lack of Proper Signature Fri 10:42 AM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The29 Notice of Appearance filed on 9/15/2016 was improperly signed by RYAN P. FORD. As such, Mr. Ford was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." This deficiency may be corrected by filing a Notice of Appearance adhering to the Electronic Filing Procedures. Thank you. (PM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul E Fogarty on behalf of Defendants PhantomlOrd, Inc., James Varga. (Fogarty, Paul)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Declaration Thu 11:41 AM
DECLARATION of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper re27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Leave Thu 11:39 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard. Noting Date 9/15/2016, (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 respm Declaration Thu 11:34 AM
DECLARATION of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper re25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Leave Thu 11:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Noting Date 9/15/2016, (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 9/16/2016 to condense text by removing individual plaintiffs names(PM).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
24 24 respm Declaration Tue 7:31 AM
DECLARATION of Trevor A. Martin filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
23 23 respm Declaration Thu 2:00 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Boyd in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration(Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Part 1,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Part 2
22 22 respm Declaration Thu 1:56 PM
DECLARATION of Gavin W. Skok in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration(Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
21 21 motion Compel Thu 1:54 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Valve Corporation. Noting Date 9/23/2016, (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 respm Declaration Thu 12:46 PM
DECLARATION of Aaron Vick filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Thu 12:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. Noting Date 9/23/2016, (Watson, Coleman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
18 18 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 9:58 AM
ORDER re17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul C. Whalen for Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 9:22 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul C. Whalen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4584235(Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 18, 2016
16 16 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10:54 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CSGOLotto Inc (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10:34 AM
ORDER re13 14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Coleman Watson for CSGOLotto Inc, and for Trevor A. Martin, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Application Thu 9:55 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Coleman Watson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin Receipt No. 0981-4568705 (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 9:41 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Coleman Watson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4568705 (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ada Ko Wong on behalf of Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 3:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Damages against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jared Conley, Kevin Ryan, Andrew Punzak, Michael John McLeod, Christopher Calvi, L.L., Timothy Woelper, Samuel Joines, Jake Bohl, Jacob Williard, G.G., Ryan Klimt, Nicholas Mora, Bradford Daniels, K.M., Levi Ledbetter, P.L., Justin Chandler, G.L., Mitchell Gunter, G.M., P.S., K.M.(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), J.J., Dominic Allen, L.O., Ryan Ford, N.M., Dylan Latvis, Michael Alphin, A.D., Nicholas Crain, Scott Hallman, S.S., Rahul Malhotra, A.L., Daniel Spann, Peter Kamenkovich, Jacob Phillips, Dakota Barney, Isaac Lynn, Vincent Cianfaglione, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, B. S., Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Jayme Reed, C. D., C. B., William Garvin, Skyler Schuman.(Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12:38 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jasper D. Ward for All Plaintiffs by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12:01 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jasper D. Ward IV FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael John McLeod (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4562168 (Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
8 8 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10:15 AM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles B Casper for Valve Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10:03 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles B. Casper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valve Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4560111 (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
6 6 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Tue 9:51 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc JCC-Set Status Conference Tue 9:15 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 11/15/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 11:43 AM
Attorneys Shata L. Stucky and James Harlan Wendell for Valve Corporation added; per3 Notice of Appearance. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
4 4 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 3:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Valve Corporation (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gavin William Skok on behalf of Defendant Valve Corporation. (Skok, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2016
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 4:31 PM
Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Valve Corporation, CSGOLotto, OPSkins Group Inc, James Varga, PhantomL0rd Inc, CSGOShuffle, Trevor A. Martin, Thomas Cassell.(DJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 4:16 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+], filed by NM, Jared Conley, Kevin Ryan, PL, Andrew Punzak, Michael John McLeod, Christopher Calvi, Timothy Woelper, KM, Samuel Joines, Jake Bohl, Jacob Williard, Ryan Klimt, Nicholas Mora, Bradford Daniels, GM, AD, GL, SS, Levi Ledbetter, Justin Chandler, Mitchell Gunter, AL, JJ, PS, Dominic Allen, Ryan Ford, GG, Dylan Latvis, Michael Alphin, Nicholas Crain, Scott Hallman, LL, LO, Rahul Malhotra, Daniel Spann, Peter Kamenkovich, Jacob Phillips, Dakota Barney, Isaac Lynn, Vincent Cianfaglione, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim.(Stephens, Kim)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4552364
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons