Job Journal, LLC
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert S Bardwil |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-25165 |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Debtor
Job Journal, LLC
Job Journal, LLC
Citrus Heights, CA 95611 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Sheri L. Carello
PO Box 22527
Sacramento, CA 95822 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Docket last updated: 10/11/2016 2:44 PM PDT |
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
Case participants added via Case Upload. | ||
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $335.00, Receipt Number: 321028, eFilingID: 5855884) (auto) | ||
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 09/14/2016 at 08:00 AM at Meeting Room 7-A. (ltas) | ||
1 | 1 68 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual All Schedules and Statements filed. (Fee Paid $335.00) (eFilingID: 5855884) | |
2 | 2 Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Sheri L. Carello (auto) | |
3 | 3 Master Address List (auto) | |
4 | 4 1 pgs Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (ltas) | |
5 | 5 Support Document/Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Re:1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Job Journal, LLC (ltas) |