Mohamed v. Irving Independent School District et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02283 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2017 3:30 AM CST |
Defendant
City of Irving
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Cummings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Irving Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohamed Elhassan Mohamed
|
Represented By
|
1. | Clock Boy and family again loses lawsuit on alleged racism of school officials. () |
Submitted Thu 03/15/2018 | |
2. | Federal judge dismisses 'Clock Boy' Ahmed Mohamed's discrimination lawsuit (cbsnews.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/22/2017 | |
3. | Family of Muslim Teen Files Federal Lawsuit against Texas School Officials (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/10/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
72 | 72
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Wed 04/10 2:47 PM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to69 Notice of Appeal filed by Mohamed Elhassan Mohamed. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court isaffirmed. Issued as Mandate: 4/10/2019. (svc) |
|
71 | 71
appeal
USCA Opinion
Wed 04/10 2:42 PM
Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re69 Notice of Appeal filed by Mohamed Elhassan Mohamed. (svc) (Main Document 71 replaced on 4/10/2019) (svc) |