SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. et al v. Autel Robotics USA LLC et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Referred: | Christopher J Burke |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00706 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 3:52 AM EST |
Defendant
Autel Aerial Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Autel Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Autel Robotics USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DJI Europe B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
624 | 624
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 08/20 10:33 AM
REDACTED VERSION of590 Proposed Pretrial Order, by DJI Europe B.V., DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd..(Dudash, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-5, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 7-9, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 13 | ||
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
623 | 623
misc
Redacted Document
Thu 08/19 6:37 PM
REDACTED VERSION of618 Letter by DJI Europe B.V., DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.. (Dudash, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
622 | 622
5
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 08/17 3:23 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) |
|
621 | 621
misc
- Transcript
Tue 08/17 11:22 AM
Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on August 4, 2021 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, email: gaffigan@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2021. (bpg) |
|
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/17 2:56 PM
SO ORDERED, re620 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd., DJI Europe B.V., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/17/21. (ntl) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
620 | 620
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/16 4:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of all Claims and Counterclaims With Prejudice by DJI Europe B.V., DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.. (Dudash, Amy) |