Glorias Ranch L L C v. Tauren Exploration Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01171 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1452 Removal of claim in civil action related to BK. case |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 3:28 AM CST |
Defendant
Calvin A Wallen, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fossil Operating Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Langtry Mineral & Development L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tauren Exploration Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glorias Ranch L L C
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
transfer
District Transfer Out (Form Included)
Fri 10/28 9:51 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Northern District of Texas. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
District Transfer/Remand Record Received
Fri 10/28 4:02 PM
DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Northern District of Texas on 10/28/16, case number 3:16-cv-3016. (crt,Dunford, T) |
||
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Fri 10/28 9:38 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Transfer Case. Venue is transferred to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/27/2016. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Thu 10/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Kevin W Hammond on behalf of Tauren Exploration Inc regarding9 Notice of Deficiency,8 Amended Notice of Removal. Action taken: Terminated Notice of Deficiency re8 Amended Notice of Removal. Notice of Deficiency issued in error. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 10/12 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Kevin W Hammond on behalf of Tauren Exploration Inc regarding8 Amended Notice of Removal. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this amended pleading. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/10 4:57 PM
NOTICE by Tauren Exploration Inc of Amended Notice of Removal re1 Notice of Removal, (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Motion Setting (without date)
Fri 09/30 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Transfer Case
Thu 09/29 4:55 PM
First MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas by Tauren Exploration Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/11 3:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fossil Operating, Inc.. (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/11 3:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Langtry Mineral & Development, LLC. (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/11 3:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tauren Exploration, Inc. (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/11 10:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tauren Exploration, Inc re1 Notice of Removal, (aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 08/11 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 592,839-A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3147229) filed by Tauren Exploration, Inc.(Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Tauren Exploration, Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Hammond, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1st JDC File | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/11 3:28 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |