Torrey v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Richard Nelson |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02715 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 3:10 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Kristyn Torrey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristyn Torrey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/20 1:26 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/19/2017. (SMD) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 03/14 9:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Settlement Conference held on 3/13/2017. Settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. Any transcript of the terms of settlement is Confidential and shall be SEALED, with access being allowed only to the parties and their counsel. (AKL) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Mon 02/06 7:00 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Freske, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/06 6:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Kemmitt on behalf of Kristyn Torrey. (Kemmitt, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/19 4:59 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/19/2017. (KNK) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Fri 12/02 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Operana, Brandon) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/02 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Freske on behalf of Kristyn Torrey. (Freske, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/10 12:26 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2016. Discovery due by 12/1/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2016. Motions (disp) due by 4/3/2017. Ready for trial due by 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/10/2016. (las) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 11/10 7:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/9/2016. Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (las) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 11/02 8:06 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Kristyn Torrey. Jointly Signed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/01 10:30 AM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE re DATE AND TIME OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: At the request of Plaintiff's counsel (ECF No. 13), the pretrial scheduling conference is being rescheduled. The conference will now be conducted on NOVEMBER 9, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer in St. Paul Courtroom 6B. (JMK) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Mon 10/31 5:03 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kristyn Torrey . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 10/12 8:39 AM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (ERISA CASES) - Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/12/2016.(las) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/10 4:23 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. MetLife is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 10/10 2:15 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Kristyn Torrey. by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Wed 08/31 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/31 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 11:05 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/16/16. (MAM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 08/16 9:56 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5063755 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/15 12:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/12/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/15 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/12 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (TSS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 08/12 9:19 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 16-cv-2715 (SRN/HB). (TSS) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/11 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5058758.) Filed by Kristyn Torrey. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |