Richard-Coulibaly v. Kyles et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ron Clark |
Referred: | Zack Hawthorn |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00328 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 06, 2017 2:50 AM CST |
Defendant
Mitchell Normand
|
|
Defendant
Walter Kyles
|
|
Defendant
Walter Kyles, III
|
|
Defendant
Legacy Community Health
|
|
Defendant
MHMR Spindletop
|
|
Defendant
Juliet Marks
|
|
Defendant
Memorial Herman Baptist Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Mike Smith Auto Group
|
|
Defendant
Mobiloil Federal Credit Union
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Mouton
|
|
Defendant
FNU Nicelas
|
|
Defendant
Michael Nixon
|
|
Defendant
FNU Keen
|
|
Defendant
Jermaine Redeaux
|
|
Defendant
Darrick Washington
|
|
Defendant
Some Other Place
|
|
Defendant
State Farm Insurance
|
|
Defendant
FNU Swan
|
|
Defendant
Texas State Board of Insurance
|
|
Defendant
Matt Turner
|
|
Defendant
Babe Walker
|
|
Defendant
Shirley Walker
|
|
Defendant
Walter Kyles Jr Insurance
|
|
Defendant
Jimmy Joinet
|
|
Defendant
John Adolph
|
|
Defendant
Becky Ames
|
|
Defendant
Antioch Baptish Church
|
|
Defendant
FNU Barton
|
|
Defendant
FNU Beat
|
|
Defendant
Deberah Thomas Bernard
|
|
Defendant
Tina Broussard
|
|
Defendant
Nicole Kyle Burton
|
|
Defendant
FNU Butler
|
|
Defendant
Christus St Elizabeth Hospital
|
|
Defendant
City Counsel
|
|
Defendant
City of Beaumont
|
|
Defendant
Disability Office
|
|
Defendant
Enterprise Rental Car
|
|
Defendant
Tamara Gasaway
|
|
Defendant
Mike Getz
|
|
Defendant
Tanna Harris
|
|
Defendant
Kyles Hayes
|
|
Defendant
JC Tayler Insurance
|
|
Defendant
Lt FNU Jackson
|
|
Plaintiff
Corey Jolivet
|
|
Plaintiff
Thefarro Richard-Coulibaly
1960 Glendale Street
Beaumont, TX 77707 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/03 12:03 PM
ORDER to Administratively Close Case. Any pending motions are denied for administrative purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/3/17. (tkd, ) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 02/02 3:51 PM
Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of5 Order by Thefarro Richard-Coulibaly on 1/31/2017. (tkd, ) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/02 5:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: 10:44 am - 10:47 am. Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2017 re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thefarro Richard-Coulibaly. Plaintiff did not appear for the hearing. Court to enter an order administratively closing the case. (FTR Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, ) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Tue 01/24 10:14 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2017 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/23/17. (tkd, ) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 08/18 2:14 PM
ORDER Concerning Filing Subsequent Complaints. Pltf is BARRED from filing any pro se in forma pauperis civil proceedings in the Eastern District of TX without the advance written permission of a judge of the court. If Richard-Coulibaly files a motion for leave to file a new complaint, the proposed complaint must be attached to the motion, which will be filed as a miscellaneous case. Except for a notice of appeal in this case or a motion for leave (as described above), pltf is also BARRED from filing any additional motions, pleadings, affidavits, or documents in this case or any previous case that she has filed with the Eastern District of Texas. The Clerk of Court is directed to return to Richard-Coulibaly, unfiled, any attempted submission inconsistent with this bar until otherwise directed by the court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/18/16. (tkd, ) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Recusal
Fri 08/12 11:26 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/12/2016. (bjc, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/12 10:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thefarro Richard-Coulibaly. (bjc, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/12 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against John Adolph, Becky Ames, Antioch Baptish Church, FNU Barton, FNU Beat, Deberah Thomas Bernard, Tina Broussard, Nicole Kyle Burton, FNU Butler, Christus St Elizabeth Hospital, City Counsel, City of Beaumont, Disability Office, Enterprise Rental Car, Tamara Gasaway, Mike Getz, Tanna Harris, Kyles Hayes, JC Tayler Insurance, FNU Jackson, Jimmy Joinet, FNU Keen, Walter Kyles, III, Walter Kyles, Legacy Community Health, MHMR Spindletop, Juliet Marks, Memorial Herman Baptist Hospital, Mike Smith Auto Group, Mobiloil Federal Credit Union, Elizabeth Mouton, FNU Nicelas, Michael Nixon, Mitchell Normand, Jermaine Redeaux, Some Other Place, State Farm Insurance, FNU Swan, Texas State Board of Insurance, Matt Turner, Babe Walker, Shirley Walker, Walter Kyles Jr Insurance, Darrick Washington, filed by Thefarro Richard-Coulibaly.(bjc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/12 9:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-07. (bjc, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 08/12 10:03 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . Mailed consent form to Plaintiff. (bjc, ) |