Freeman v. Glanz et al
Oklahoma Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory K Frizzell |
Referred: | Frank H Mccarthy |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00534 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2017 3:19 AM CST |
Defendant
Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stanley Glanz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vic Regalado
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Lee Freeman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County
Terminated: 08/17/2016
|
|
Defendant
Emergency Medical Services Authority
Terminated: 08/17/2016
|
|
Defendant
Tulsa County Sheriff's Office
Terminated: 08/17/2016
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
153 | 153
order
01 - Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Fri 09/11 10:50 AM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; accepting152 Report and Recommendation (lah, Chambers) |