Hernandez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-02889 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 12, 2017 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TD Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector D Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
HSBC Bank, USA, National Association
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 01/03 11:20 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/3/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/29 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Hector D Hernandez(Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Mon 11/21 4:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CONSTRUING as a Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 motion the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice,37 , that Plaintiff Hector Hernandez and Defendant HSBC Bank, USA, National Association filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), regarding the dismissal with prejudice of Defendant HSBC Bank, USA, National Association and not the remaining Defendants; and GRANTING the motion37 , given that it is unopposed, will not prejudice the opposing party, is not made in bad faith, and is not futile. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(b); MTB Servs., Inc. v. Tuckman-Barbee Constr. Co., No. RDB 12-2109 2013 WL 1819944, at *3 (D. Md. Apr. 30, 2013); see also Young v. UPS, No. DKC 08-2586 2011 WL 665321, at *7 (D. Md. Feb. 14, 2011) (stating that when a plaintiff wants to dismiss less than an entire action, Rule 15 is the proper vehicle). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/21/16. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/21 10:34 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant HSBC Bank, USA, National Association by Hector D Hernandez(Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/18 12:49 PM
MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/18/2016 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
35 | 35
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 10/18 9:57 AM
Status Conference held on 10/18/2016 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/14 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Marie Debevec on behalf of HSBC Bank, USA, National Association (Debevec, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/12 11:59 AM
NOTICE by Hector D Hernandez (Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) Disclosure) (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/06 11:21 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TD Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate Target Corporation, Other Affiliate TD Bank US Holding Company, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, National Association.. (Roswell, Craig) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Fri 09/30 2:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling R.16 telephone conference call. The call will be held on October 18, 2016 at 9:30am. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/30/2016. (Grimm, Paul) (jlb) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/28 5:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/28/2016.(bus, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Discovery Order | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Wed 09/28 3:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on October 19, 2016 at 9:30a.m AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/28/2016. (ats, Chambers) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/26 1:49 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank, USA, National Association identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Finance Corporation, Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings PLC, a United Kingdom corporation for HSBC Bank, USA, National Association.. (Lucchesi, Thomas) |
|
notice
Deficiency Notice
Mon 09/26 8:28 AM
Deficiency Notice -- The Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statements as to TD Bank, National Association and HSBC Bank, USA, National Association have not been filed. The Statements must be filed by 10/6/2016 (bus, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 3:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by HSBC Card Services Inc. (improperly identified as HSBC Bank USA, National Association) by HSBC Bank, USA, National Association.(Lucchesi, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 1:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by TD Bank, National Association.(Roswell, Craig) |
|
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/23 11:59 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(DeVougas, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/19 10:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph M Windler. Directing attorney Joseph M Windler to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/15 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association (Robbins, Edward) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/15 1:54 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Windler (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6239694.) by TD Bank, National Association (Roswell, Craig) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Mon 09/12 1:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING16 Stipulation filed by TD Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/12/2016. (ats, Chambers) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/12 8:44 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association.. (Schultz, Zachary) |
|
19 | 19
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 09/12 8:28 AM
QC NOTICE:17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association was filed incorrectly. **Please refile Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement as corporate affiliations and/or those with financial interest should be entered when the system prompts you do to so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/09 2:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Schultz, Zachary) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/09 2:20 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Schultz, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/08 4:30 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, For Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by TD Bank, National Association. (Roswell, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/07 11:50 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (DeVougas, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 09/07 8:39 AM
QC NOTICE:11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **When filing a Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Form, all Corporate Parents and Other Affiliates must be entered. Please re-file the document and enter all Coporate Parents and Other Affiliates when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bus, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 09/06 10:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART Stipulations9 ,12 : The deadline for Defendants HSBC Bank and Experian to respond to the Complaint is extended to September 23, 2016. No further extensions shall be granted absent a showing of compelling circumstances. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/6/16. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/02 10:53 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (DeVougas, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/02 10:44 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (DeVougas, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/02 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Denzel DeVougas on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (DeVougas, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/02 9:36 AM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HSBC Bank, USA, National Association. (Lucchesi, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/02 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Francis Lucchesi, III on behalf of HSBC Bank, USA, National Association (Lucchesi, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/25 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hector D Hernandez. TD Bank, National Association served on 8/22/2016, answer due 9/12/2016. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/25 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hector D Hernandez. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 8/19/2016, answer due 9/9/2016. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/25 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hector D Hernandez. HSBC Bank, USA, National Association served on 8/19/2016, answer due 9/9/2016. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/25 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hector D Hernandez. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/19/2016, answer due 9/9/2016. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Pre-Motion Conference Letter
Thu 08/18 9:46 AM
PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE LETTER TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/18/2016. (ats, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/17 10:43 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., HSBC Bank, USA, National Association, JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, TD Bank, National Association. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/16 6:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6187258.), filed by Hector D Hernandez.(Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons for Experian Information Solutions, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons for TD Bank, National Association, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit HSBC Bank, USA, National Association |