Thom Parson v. Vanguard Group Inc
Original Case: 2:15-cv-03942
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03410 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
VANGUARD GROUP INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOM W. PARSON
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 01 2017
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: CHAGARES, VANASKIE and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 10. Judge: CHAGARES Authoring. |
Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 4:37 AM EDT |
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Thom W. Parson in District Court No. 2-15-cv-03942. (CJG) |