HAGEN v. JOHN DOE COMPANY
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Esther Salas |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05050 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 14, 2017 4:24 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOE COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT HAGEN
2153 Cameron Circle
Birmingham, AL 35242 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/02 12:12 PM
ORDER that the time for either party to file an appropriate motion to seal the Court's February 14, 2018 Memorandum Opinion (D.E. No. 35) has EXPIRED. An unsealed version of the February 14, 2018 Memorandum Opinion shall issue on this date this Order shall NOT be construed to supersede the Court's February 14, 2018 Order (see D.E. No. 36) in any form; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/2/18. (sr, ) |
|
37 | 37
8
pgs
order
Opinion
Fri 03/02 12:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/2/18. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/14 9:51 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Hagen's amended Complaint (D.E. No. 11) is dismissed without prejudice to filing his complaint in the Superior Court of New Jersey. The accompanying Memorandum Opinion shall be temporarily filed UNDER SEAL and shall be unsealed 14 days from publication of this Order on the Courts ECF System unless an appropriate motion to seal the Memorandum Opinion, accompanied by proposed redactions, is filed by either party, or jointly by the parties, on or before February 27, 2018; etc. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/14/18. (sr, )(N/M) |
|
35 | 35
order
Opinion
Wed 02/14 9:42 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/14/18. (sr, ) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Fri 01/26 1:50 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Diane L. Prucino to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8429942.) (WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Fri 01/26 3:37 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DIANE L. PRUCINO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 09/12 5:03 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JOHN DOE COMPANY re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (WHITMER, FREDERICK) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 08/31 11:56 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File a reply brief in support of Motion to Dismiss until 9/13/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/31/17. (sr, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/31 8:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/30 5:14 PM
NOTICE by JOHN DOE COMPANY of Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss(WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Frederick Whitmer, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/29 1:33 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/29/17. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/24 9:02 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ROBERT HAGEN re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (sr, ) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Stay
Fri 08/11 2:21 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by JOHN DOE COMPANY.(WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/11 2:16 PM
NOTICE by JOHN DOE COMPANY of Motion to Stay Discovery (WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 08/11 5:01 PM
Letter from ROBERT HAGEN. (ld, ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Tue 08/08 10:44 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Seal Document 17 Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/8/17. (cm, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 3:06 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Diane L. Prucino, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/25/17. (sr, ) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Fri 07/14 1:13 PM
ORDER permitting Plaintiff a 30-day extension of time to respond to Defendant Mercedes Benz's filings of 7/3/17 including their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/14/17. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Thu 07/13 3:24 PM
Letter from Robert Hagen requesting additional time to respond to Deft, Mercedes-Benz's 7/3/17 filings (sr, ) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 07/10 2:26 PM
LETTER ORDER: The Court shall enter a scheduling order setting forth dates for discovery. The parties shall file a proposed discovery plan by 3:00 p.m. on 8/11/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/10/2017. (jqb, ) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/06 2:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,18 MOTION to Seal Document17 Exhibit (to Document),, ,20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diane L. Prucino . Motion set for 8/7/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 6:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diane L. Prucino by JOHN DOE COMPANY.(WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Frederick L. Whitmer in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Diane L. Prucino in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/03 6:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHN DOE COMPANY identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Seal Document
Mon 07/03 5:53 PM
MOTION to Seal Document17 Exhibit (to Document),, by JOHN DOE COMPANY.(WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Frederick L. Whitmer in Support of Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Index in Support of Motion to Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal | ||
17 | 17
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 07/03 5:25 PM
Exhibit to16 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN DOE COMPANY. (WHITMER, FREDERICK) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/03 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN DOE COMPANY.(WHITMER, FREDERICK) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/02 10:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT HAGEN. ROBERT HAGEN waiver sent on 5/3/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 2:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED (AMENDED COMPLAINT) as to JOHN DOE COMPANY with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (sr, ) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Fri 04/21 1:41 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT HAGEN as to JOHN DOE COMPANY. (sr, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 04/11 11:40 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/17. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/18 8:55 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 01/18 8:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Seal
Wed 01/18 8:54 AM
MOTION to Seal the Amended Complaint by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) |
|
Att: 1 (proposed) finding of Fact, | ||
Att: 2 proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 cover letter, | ||
Att: 4 proposed order | ||
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 12/15 3:55 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Seal to the right of any movant to file a renewed motion to seal that complies fully with all requirements and provisions of Local Civil Rules 5.3(c) and 7.1(d); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/15/16. (sr, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Tue 11/01 10:27 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) |
||
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/31 2:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 10/31 2:18 PM
Exhibit to7 Motion to Seal by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 amended complt. | ||
7 | 7
motion
Seal
Mon 10/31 2:15 PM
MOTION to Seal by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) |
|
Att: 1 amended complaint, | ||
Att: 2 cover letter | ||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 10/24 1:41 PM
ORDER permitting Plaintiff an extension of time to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/24/16. (sr, ) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application/Petition
Tue 10/18 11:03 AM
LETTER APPLICATION requesting an extension of time to file a Motion to Seal by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Seal Case
Tue 10/04 2:35 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion to Seal Case without prejudice to the right of any movant to file a renewed motion to seal that complies fully with all requirements and provisions of Local Civil Rules 5.3(c) and 7.1(d); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/4/16. (sr, )(N/M) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/14 10:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Seal Case. Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/14 10:50 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by ROBERT HAGEN.(sr, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Seal Case
Wed 09/14 10:48 AM
LETTER/MOTION requesting to Seal Case by ROBERT HAGEN. (sr, ) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/18 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW030534), filed by ROBERT HAGEN.(ek) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
QC - Generic Message
Mon 08/22 12:03 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advice, the Court does not issue summons for unknown entities. (ek) |