Strait et al v. Orbital ATK, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George B Daniels |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06563 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 14, 2017 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
Orbital ATK, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Garrett E. Pierce
|
|
Defendant
David W. Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Alona Strait
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Thu 08/25 2:17 PM
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), Plaintiff Alona Strait ("Plaintiff") hereby voluntarily dismisses her action, Strait v.Orbital ATK, et al., Case No. 1:16-cv-06563-GBD, brought before the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, without prejudice, as to all defendants. As grounds thereof, Plaintiff states that no defendant has filed an answer or a motion to dismiss to Plaintiff's action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/25/2016) (ama) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/24 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) Orbital ATK, Inc., Garrett E. Pierce, David W. Thompson. Document filed by Alona Strait. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 08/22 3:51 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Wednesday, November 9, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. (As further set forth in this Order) Initial Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/22/2016) (kl) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/19 10:57 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orbital ATK, Inc., Garrett E. Pierce, David W. Thompson. (rch) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 08/19 10:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alona Strait. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 08/19 11:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 08/19 11:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 08/19 11:00 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 08/18 6:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 08/18 6:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ORBITAL ATK, INC., DAVID W. THOMPSON, and GARRETT E. PIERCE, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alona Strait, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated,. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/18 6:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Orbital ATK, Inc., Garrett E. Pierce, David W. Thompson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12668131)Document filed by Alona Strait, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated,.(Portnoy, Lesley) |