Coyle v. Aegis Therapies, Inc et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | Steven E Rau |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02781 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 14, 2017 3:14 AM CST |
Defendant
GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Coyle
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Aegis Therapies-Minnesota Rehab, LLC
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aegis Therapies, Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Fri 11/03 10:35 AM
JUDGMENT(kt) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/02 3:58 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the parties Joint Stipulation43 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, without costs or disbursements to any party. LET JUDGMENT BY ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 11/02/2017. (LLM) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation
Wed 11/01 2:22 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re43 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
43 | 43
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/01 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC and Aegis Therapies, Inc.. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 2:17 PM
AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (KLL) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 10/24 11:41 AM
ORDER: Judge Richard H. Kyle to assume inactive senior status. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/23/2017. (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Wed 09/27 2:07 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Trial Ready date: Ready for trial due by October 1, 2018. (JEP) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/03 11:18 AM
SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/29/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 1/2/2018. Motions (disp) due by 2/2/2018. Ready for trial due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/3/2017. (ACH) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation
Tue 08/01 4:01 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re37 Stipulation. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/01 4:00 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by Aegis Therapies, Inc. and GGNSC Administrative Services. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/28 12:51 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2017. Discovery due by 8/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 11/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 3/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 4/28/2017. (ACH) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation
Tue 04/25 1:52 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re34 Stipulation. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 1:51 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC and Aegis Therapies, Inc.. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/16 7:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aegis Therapies, Inc., GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Filed by Donna Coyle. No summons requested. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Wed 02/15 2:38 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Plaintiff shall, within one week of the date of this Order, file the Amended Complaint previously filed as Exhibit A to the Stipulation of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 2/15/2017. (ACH) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/13 4:05 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC.(Frank, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A: Redlined and clean copy of amended complaint | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Tue 12/20 1:27 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/20/2016. (ACH) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/15 8:55 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Donna Coyle. (Mattingly, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Mon 12/05 10:03 AM
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/5/2016. (ACH) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/02 9:24 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Wed 11/30 2:57 PM
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/30/2016. (ACH) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/23 4:10 PM
STIPULATION Governing Preservation, Search, Review and Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Donna Coyle. Jointly Signed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Docketing Correction
Fri 11/18 12:48 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT CASE. for 23 Order, 24 Scheduling Order. (MMP) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/17 3:55 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2017. Discovery due by 6/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 9/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 1/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/17/2016. (ACH) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 11/14 12:20 PM
AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Donna Coyle.(Roesch, Charles) Modified text on 11/14/2016 (kt) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 11/07 11:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2016. Parties will submit Amended Rule26(f) Report within 7 days. (kt) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 10/31 4:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Donna Coyle.(Roesch, Charles) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order (Text Only)
Mon 10/17 3:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Attorney Mattingly's request to appear via telephone for the 11/7/2016 Pretrial Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. The attorney should call chambers at 651-848-1620 to be connected to the conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/17/2016. (MME) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/14 10:15 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC Requesting Attendance by Telephone at 11/7/16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference . (Mattingly, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 10/11 4:26 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/11/16.(LEG) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/05 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James H Kaster on behalf of Donna Coyle. (Kaster, James) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/05 11:20 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael B. Mattingly for GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/5/16. (MAM) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/05 11:19 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles M. Roesch for GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/5/16. (MAM) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Mon 10/03 4:45 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael B. Mattingly. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5132251 by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Girouard, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Mon 10/03 4:44 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles M. Roesch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5132240 by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Girouard, Mark) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/30 2:44 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Drumm Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Girouard, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/30 2:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC. (Girouard, Mark) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order (Text Only)
Thu 09/29 9:58 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Defendant GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC is directed to file its Answer no later than Friday, September 30, 2016. Entered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/29/2016. (MME) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/26 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donna Coyle (Schlesinger, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order (Text Only)
Tue 09/13 8:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Defendants shall answer the Compliant on or before September 26, 2016. Entered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/13/2016. (MME) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/12 4:00 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Aegis Therapies, Inc., Aegis Therapies-Minnesota Rehab, LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Girouard, Mark) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 08/19 12:05 PM
ORDER regarding Judge Richard H. Kyle's dispositive motion procedure. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 8/19/16. (KLL) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/19 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Aegis Therapies, Inc., Aegis Therapies-Minnesota Rehab, LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 08/19 9:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Individual Employment Civil Rights List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 16-cv-2781 RHK/SER. (kt) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/18 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5068785.) Filed by Donna Coyle. Filer requests summons issued. (Frank, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |