Josef Maatuk v. Emerson Electric, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06177 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2017 1:03 AM PST |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Emerson Electric, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prasad Khadkikar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Therm-O-Disc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernd Zimmerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josef Maatuk
1607 South Sherbourne Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90035 |
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 12/20 5:44 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Ohio, 1:16-cv-03023 filed 12/19/2016. (lom) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Transferring Case
Mon 12/19 11:23 AM
ORDER RE PROCEEDINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO [DOC # 10]; DEFENDANT EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED [DOC # 12]; AND DEFENDANTS BERND ZIMMERMANN AND PRASAD KHADKIKAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [DOC # 13] by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants' Motion10 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion to dismiss for improper venue is DENIED. The motion in the alternative to transfer this case to the Northern District of Ohio is GRANTED; and Defendants' Motions12 and13 are GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case sent electronically on 12/19/2016. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
27 | 27
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 12/19 9:19 AM
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Based on the Tentative issued on November 21, 2016, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendants'motions to dismiss12 13 , are GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants' motion10 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court would GRANT the motion to dismiss without prejudice, DENY the motion to dismiss for improper venue, and GRANT the motion in the alternative to transfer this case to the Northern District of Ohio. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Thu 12/08 11:26 AM
STATUS REPORT ***Joint Status Report*** filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 11/23 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Re Proceedings re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted 12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10(Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Motion Hearing Dismiss ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 11/22 11:16 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO10 ;DEFENDANT EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED12 ; DEFENDANTS BERND ZIMMERMANN AND PRASADKHADKTKAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION13 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Post-Mediation Status Conference for December 15, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint status report by December 13, 2016. Telephone appearances are allowed provided notice is given to the clerk two business days prior to the hearing. Please refer to the Court's order and tentative order for specifics. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 11/08 2:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 11/07 2:34 PM
REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 13 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 11/07 2:32 PM
REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted 12 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 11/07 2:30 PM
REPLY reply in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 11/03 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10 filed by Plaintiff Josef Maatuk. (shb) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/01 12:08 PM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting17 Non-Resident Attorney David P. Utykanski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants EMERSON ELECTRIC, CO., THERM-O-DISC, INC., BERND ZIMMERMANN and PRASAD KHADKIKAR, designating Paul T. Martin as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 10/27 3:52 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David P. Utykanski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18794905) filed by defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 10/20 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman, (Martin, Paul) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 10/20 10:27 AM
DECLARATION of Prasad Khadkikar in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman.(Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
14 | 14
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 10/20 10:24 AM
DECLARATION of Bernd Zimmermann in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (Martin, Paul) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 10/20 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Defendants Bernd Zimmermann and Prasad Khadkikar's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 10/20 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Emerson Electric Co.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted | ||
11 | 11
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 10/20 9:33 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio 10 filed by Defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman.(Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 10/20 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio filed by defendants Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 PM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attorney Paul T Martin added to party Emerson Electric, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul T Martin added to party Prasad Khadkikar(pty:dft), Attorney Paul T Martin added to party Therm-O-Disc(pty:dft), Attorney Paul T Martin added to party Bernd Zimmerman(pty:dft)) (Martin, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Action to the Northern District of Ohio | ||
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 10/17 10:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josef Maatuk, upon Defendant Emerson Electric, Inc. served on 9/19/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Wright, CT Corporation System, authorized agent in compliance with statute not specified by certified mail on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. (mrgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 10/17 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josef Maatuk, upon Defendant Therm-O-Disc served on 9/19/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Wright, CT Corporation System, authorized agent in compliance with statute not specified by certified mail on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. (mrgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 10/17 10:08 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josef Maatuk, upon Defendant Bernd Zimmerman served on 9/23/2016, answer due 10/14/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon defendant in compliance with statute not specified by certified mail. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 08/24 2:39 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transfer Pursuant to Patent Pilot Program (CV-128)
Mon 08/22 1:42 PM
ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge George H. King. Case transferred from Judge George H. King to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:16-cv-06177 GW (JPRx). (esa) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 08/18 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/18 11:05 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Josef Maatuk. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/18 11:04 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 08/18 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, Emerson Electric, Inc., Prasad Khadkikar, Therm-O-Disc, Bernd Zimmerman.Case assigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by Plaintiff Josef Maatuk. (esa) |