Physician Partners of America, LLC v. Business Microvar, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James D Whittemore |
Referred: | Mark A Pizzo |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-02371 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 14, 2017 4:24 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Business Microvar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Physician Partners of America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Business Microvar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Physician Partners of America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order dismissing case
Mon 07/17 3:18 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to 27 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 7/15/2017. (AEN) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/14 10:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Business Microvar, Inc.. (Gray, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/15 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Taking Deposition via Video Conference of Sherlene Sorensen by Physician Partners of America, LLC (Pratico, Steven) Modified on 5/15/2017 DOCUMENT TERMINATED, Local Rule 3.03 Discovery (BES) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of unavailability
Mon 04/24 9:30 AM
NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Business Microvar, Inc. from May 8-10, 17-19, 2017; June 12-16, 2017; July 5-7, 14-24, 2017; July 31-August 7, 2017. (Gray, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 3:54 PM
NOTICE by Physician Partners of America, LLC of Serving Proposal for Settlement (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of unavailability
Mon 04/17 10:37 AM
NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Physician Partners of America, LLC. (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Mediation report
Fri 03/31 3:49 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 31, 2017. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Case, James) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of selection of mediator
Fri 02/10 12:04 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF SELECTION of James R. Case as mediator by Physician Partners of America, LLC. (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
*Order pdf
Mon 02/06 1:53 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file an amended stipulation of mediation within 14 days. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 2/6/2017. (SMA) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
Notice of selection of mediator
Fri 01/20 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of James R. Case as mediator by Physician Partners of America, LLC. (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/13 4:06 PM
NOTICE by Physician Partners of America, LLC Taking Deposition - Hilton (Pratico, Steven) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/13 4:05 PM
NOTICE by Physician Partners of America, LLC Taking Deposition -Erickson (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 10/12 9:31 AM
ORDER denying as moot 15 Status report/Motion to Compel Response filed by Business Microvar, Inc. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 10/11/2016. (AO) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status report
Fri 09/30 10:57 AM
STATUS report Defendant's Response to Court Order or Alternative Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatories by Business Microvar, Inc..(Gray, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C | ||
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case management and scheduling order
Fri 09/23 3:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 AM; Bench Trial set for 3/5/2018 at 08:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13 B before Judge James D. Whittemore. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 9/23/2016. (AO) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 09/20 4:09 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pratico, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 09/14 9:22 AM
REPLY to 9 Counterclaim by Physician Partners of America, LLC. Related document: 9 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Business Microvar, Inc..(Pratico, Steven) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on motion to extend time
Fri 09/02 11:22 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 9/1/2016. (AO) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend time
Wed 08/31 6:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Comply with August 25, 2016 Order by Business Microvar, Inc.. (McElfatrick, Brian) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 08/25 4:57 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Physician Partners of America, LLC by Business Microvar, Inc..(McElfatrick, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 08/25 2:53 PM
ORDER directing Defendant to file a notice identifying the citizenship of Plaintiff's members. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 8/25/2016. (AO) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Thu 08/25 4:59 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael R. Gray, appearing on behalf of Business Microvar, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA038723.) Related document:4 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Gray to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Compliance notice
Tue 08/23 4:51 PM
NOTICE of compliance by Business Microvar, Inc. (McElfatrick, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Tue 08/23 9:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER 4 motion to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED contingent upon counsel's submission of the required Special Admission Attorney Certification form and payment of the $150.00 special admission fee. Failure to submit the form and fee within ten (10) days of the date of this Order shall result in counsel's appearance being stricken from the record. MICHAEL R. GRAY, ESQ. ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE. BRIAN T. MCELFATRICK, ESQ. AND ALICIA J. SCHUMACHER, ESQ. DESIGNATED LOCAL COUNSEL. Counsel are further notified that pursuant to the USDC - Middle District of Florida's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases, Section I(A) "... all documents filed in Civil and Criminal cases in this District... shall be filed electronically." Therefore, the attorneys being admitted pro hac vice is/are directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in their CM/ECF account and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order within thirty (30) days. Failure to comply with this Order as directed will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 8/23/2016. (AEN) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Mon 08/22 10:40 AM
NOTICE to counsel Michael r. Gray of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/19 1:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Gray to appear pro hac vice by Business Microvar, Inc.. (McElfatrick, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of designation of track
Fri 08/19 11:29 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (AO) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/19 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Business Microvar, Inc. filed by Physician Partners of America, LLC. Filed in state court 7/15/2016.(CTR) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 08/19 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 16-CA-6621 filed in State Court on 7/15/2016. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA038601 filed by Business Microvar, Inc..(CTR) |
|
Att: 1 State Records, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |