Salazar-Valenzuela v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Referred: | John Z Boyle |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02800 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/30 8:08 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Oscar Salazar-Valenzuela. Reason for return: unclaimed/unable to forward. Document number3 . (KGM) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/26 9:31 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Oscar Salazar-Valenzuela. Reason for return: unclaimed/not in custody. Document number2 . (KGM) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 08/22 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT: in accordance with the Court's Order filed August 22, 2016, movant's motion for Sentence Relief Under the Federal Prison Bureau Non-Violent Offender Relief Act of 2003 is denied and the civil action opened in connection with the motion is hereby dismissed, re: CR 16-265-PHX-DGC. (REW) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 08/22 3:07 PM
ORDER: Movant's Motion1 for Sentence Relief Under the Federal Prison Bureau Non-Violent Offender Relief Act of 2003 is denied and that the civil action opened in connection with this Motion is dismissed; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly; in the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable, re: CR 16-0265 PHX-DGC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/16. (REW) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 08/19 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (HLA) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 08/19 2:23 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR-16-265-PHX-DGC-2 filed by Oscar Salazar-Valenzuela. (3 pages)(HLA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |