Cyber Instruments Technology LLC v. Pivotal Systems Corporation
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan R Bolton |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02802 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2017 2:36 AM MST |
Defendant
Pivotal Systems Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Cyber Instruments Technology LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minute_ord
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/14 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal16 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/13 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/01 3:40 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Rule 12(b) Order on Defendant Pivotal Systems Corporation by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC re:8 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/24 2:38 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; terminating10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/24 7:47 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marcus Rabinowitz by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC.(Rabinowitz, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 08/24 2:37 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175587 as to Marcus Rabinowitz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 08/24 2:38 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175588 as to Lawrence M Hadley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/23 4:40 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lawrence M. Hadley by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Tue 08/23 4:23 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marcus Rabinowitz filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC,10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lawrence M. Hadley filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. Required document is not attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file Federal court certificate of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/23 3:49 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lawrence M. Hadley by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/23 1:03 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marcus Rabinowitz by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Rabinowitz, Marcus) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 08/22 1:47 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/22/16. (MAW) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Mon 08/22 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Underhill, Albert) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/19 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Pivotal Systems Corporation. (KMG) |
|
5 | 5
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Fri 08/19 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (KMG) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 08/19 3:33 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13303779. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-02802 PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 08/19 3:32 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (submitted by Albert Underhill) (KMG) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/19 3:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (submitted by Albert Underhill) (KMG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/19 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13303779 filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC.(submitted by Albert Underhill)(KMG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |