Brown v. City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06581 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 15, 2017 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
City of New York
|
|
Defendant
Department of Homeless Services
|
|
Defendant
FDNY
|
|
Defendant
Interfaith Hospital
|
|
Defendant
NYPD
|
|
Plaintiff
Margie Brown
200 Tillary Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Received Returned Mail
Tue 04/11 3:48 PM
Received returned mail re:4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening),3 Order Granting IFP Application. Mail was addressed to Margie Brown, P.O. Box 3335, New York, NY 10027 and was returned for the following reason(s): Undeliverable, commerical mail receiving agency, no authorization to receive mail for this addressee. (rro) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Mon 01/09 2:31 PM
Mailed a copy of6 Order of Dismissal,7 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Margie Brown, 200 Tillary Street, Brooklyn, NY 11201. (jwh) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Fri 01/06 6:28 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued January 5, 2017, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/5/2017) (cla) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order of Dismissal
Fri 01/06 6:27 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated September 21, 2016, the Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within sixty days. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint. Accordingly, the complaint, filed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/5/2017) (cla) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Fri 01/06 6:28 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:6 Order of Dismissal,7 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (cla) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
Fri 10/21 10:15 AM
PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 10/20/16 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Margie Brown. New Address: 200 Tillary Street, Brooklyn, New York, 11201. (sc) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening)
Wed 09/21 12:28 PM
ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, captionthe document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 16-CV- 6581 (CM). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which reliefmay be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when she seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/21/2016) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (ama) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Wed 09/21 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ama) |
||
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Wed 09/21 12:28 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening),,,,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ama) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 09/21 12:32 PM
Mailed a copy of4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Margie Brown. (vj) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 09/21 12:33 PM
Mailed a copy of4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Margie Brown P.O. Box 3335 New York, NY 10027. (ca) |
||
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Wed 08/24 3:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 08/24/2016) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (ca) |
|
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 08/24 3:45 PM
Mailed a copy of3 Order Granting IFP Application to Margie Brown P.O. Box 3335 New York, NY 10027. (ca) |
||
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/22 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against City of New York, Department of Homeless Services, FDNY, Interfaith Hospital, NYPD. Document filed by Margie Brown.(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/22 4:30 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Margie Brown.(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 08/22 4:32 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |