Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio v. Pedro M. Baez et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth D Laporte |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-04824 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2017 1:28 AM PST |
Defendant
Celia Baez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pedro M. Baez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rosa Garibay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Baez Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 03/27 10:20 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 28 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 01/25 5:29 PM
AMENDED SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT JOINT SITE INSPECTION AND ORDER 25 26 : The last day for parties and counsel to hold a joint inspection of premises is reset to 2/28/2017; all other dates that are calculated based upon the inspection date will be adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/25/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 01/25 3:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Conduct Joint Site Inspection filed by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 01/25 3:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Conduct Joint Site Inspection filed by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 01/23 12:04 PM
ORDER granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Conduct Mediation by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 23 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 01/19 3:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT MEDIATION filed by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/03 12:57 PM
NOTICE by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust re15 Answer to Complaint of Filing of Verifications to Answer to Complaint (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 1/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 12/01 4:22 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Conduct Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 20 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 11/30 11:54 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend deadline for joint site inspection filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 11/30/2016) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 11/23 4:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time Under F.R.C.P. 12(f) signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 18 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 11/23 10:48 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 11/23/2016) |
|
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 11/11 2:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust.. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 11/11/2016) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 11/11 2:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 11/11/2016) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/11 2:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCelia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 11/11/2016) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 10/20 6:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio as against defendants Pedro Baez, Celia Baez, the Baez Family Trust, and Rosa Garibay (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/20/2016) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/13 8:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 10/12 4:15 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/12/2016) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 10/12 9:28 AM
Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:11 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio,10 Proposed Summons filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. Although the e-filing of docket number 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted is Correct. Docket Number 10 Proposed Summons is in a Read Only Mode Which Prevents the Clerk to Manipulate the Attachment to Execute the Issuance of Summons. Counsel to Re-E-File the 10 Proposed Summons Correctly making sure that the Attachment is Not in a Read Only Mode. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 10/11 5:07 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio as to All Defendants. Summons is being returned in order to correct errata in street number in address (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/11/2016) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 10/11 9:00 AM
Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:9 Errata filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio,10 Proposed Summons filed by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio. In order for the new Proposed Summons to be Issued. Counsel Needs to First E-file Docket Number 5 As a Summons Unexecuted. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 10/10 1:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/10/2016) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Errata
Mon 10/10 1:36 PM
ERRATA to correct typographical error in defendants' address in summons by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.(Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/10/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/07 9:57 AM
NOTICE by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio Notice of Vacation absence Plaintiff's counsel(Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 10/7/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 08/24 11:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 8/24/2016) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/24 11:55 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 8/24/2016) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/23 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Celia Baez, Pedro M. Baez, Rosa Garibay, The Baez Family Trust. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Tue 08/23 11:11 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by The Executive Committee on 8/22/16. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 08/22 3:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 08/22 2:58 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 8/22/2016) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/22 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10708570.). Filed byJose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.(Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 8/22/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |