Gomez v. Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Federico A Moreno |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23640 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 4:35 AM EST |
Defendant
Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andres Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/27 2:10 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL11 : Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/27/2016. (cgy) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 10/24 6:12 PM
ORDER DENYING SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AS MOOT9 . Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/24/2016. (cgy) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Mon 10/24 8:12 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re11 Notice of Settlement, 12 Stipulation of Dismissal. Two or More Document Events Filed as One ; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (asl) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/24 8:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC. See11 for image (asl) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 10/21 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC (Protopapadakis, Anastasia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/20 6:49 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC. (Protopapadakis, Anastasia) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 10/19 3:21 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint Unopposed by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC.(Protopapadakis, Anastasia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 09/22 11:46 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME6 . Answer or Response due by 10/20/2016. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/21/2016. (cgy) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/19 3:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC (Protopapadakis, Anastasia) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 09/19 3:57 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint by Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC. Attorney Anastasia Protopapadakis added to party Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/6/2016(Protopapadakis, Anastasia) Modified relief on 9/19/2016 (asl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 09/02 10:08 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andres Gomez. Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC served on 8/31/2016, answer due 9/21/2016. (Dinin, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/24 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC. (lrz1) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Wed 08/24 2:19 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Wed 08/24 2:19 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno (lrz1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/24 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Earl of Sandwich (USA), LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9031742, filed by Andres Gomez.(Dinin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |