HULL v. GLOBAL DIGITAL SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05153 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant
WILLIAM J. DELGADO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GLOBAL DIGITAL SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID A. LOPPERT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARTHUR F. NOTERMAN
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD J. SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
STEPHANIE C. SULLIVAN
|
|
Lead Plaintiff
MICHAEL PERRY
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
David Beasley
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
BETTY CAM LITTLE
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
Jonathan Cox
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Michael Perry
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Debbie Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Gary Blum
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Marjorie Berg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFF HULL
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 19 2017
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/19/2017. (km) |
|
GPO
Sep 14 2018
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/14/2018. (mmh) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
82 | 82
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Mon 08/22 9:45 AM
ORDER granting80 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/22/2022. (mg) |