Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc v. Nordstrom Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06374 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 1:12 AM PST |
Defendant
Nordstrom Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wilster Apparel Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 03/13 5:12 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/13 5:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice; 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are vacated and taken off calendar; and 3. Each party shall bear its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 03/13 3:38 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Nordstrom Inc, Wilster Apparel Group LLC.(Brooks, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 02/23 10:32 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Effective, March 1, 2017, Judge Kim's courtroom will be COURTROOM 23 on the 3rd floor, located at 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 23 of the Spring Street U.S. Courthouse. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Wed 02/15 12:41 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. In re: Stipulation for Protective Order24 . (mkr) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Protective Order
Tue 02/14 10:36 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 02/13 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order22 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The document is noticed before the wrong magistrate judge. The case number should read, 2:16-cv-06374-ODW (SKx); Magistrate Judge Steve Kim is assigned to this matter. Please refer to his procedures and schedules for an example of the formatting for protective orders, as well as additional instructions on submissions. http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-steve-kim. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (sbou) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Protective Order
Fri 02/10 5:51 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/05 11:06 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIALS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Jury trial: 12/12/17 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 12/717; hearing on motions in limine: 12/4/ 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 11/20/17 1:30 PM; motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 11/20/17; lodge Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file trial briefs, contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement, agreed upon set of instructions and verdict forms, joint statement regarding disputed instructions verdicts etc: 11/13/17; last day for hearing motions: 10/23/17; last date to conduct settlement conference:10/16/17; discovery cutoff: 9/11/17; last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 3/13/17 (lc) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 12/02 2:56 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc... (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 10/31 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Otis D. Wright. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Wright will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 5D on the 5th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 5D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 10/11 9:04 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Coferenc is set for December 19, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (See attached document for details.) (lom) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 10/07 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc, (Brooks, Samuel) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/07 4:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc.(Brooks, Samuel) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 10/07 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wilster Apparel Group LLC, (Brooks, Samuel) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/07 4:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Wilster Apparel Group LLC.(Brooks, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 09/21 9:14 AM
ORDER EXTENDING THE DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO OCTOBER 7, 201612 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 09/20 11:21 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nordstrom Inc answer now due 10/7/2016, filed by Defendants Wilster Apparel Group LLC; Nordstrom Inc.(Attorney Samuel G Brooks added to party Nordstrom Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel G Brooks added to party Wilster Apparel Group LLC(pty:dft))(Brooks, Samuel) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 09/19 4:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc., upon Defendant Wilster Apparel Group LLC served on 9/16/2016, answer due 10/7/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lily Tang, person apparently in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 09/15 10:43 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing. Inc., upon Defendant Nordstrom Inc served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys Aguilera, person authorized to receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 08/26 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. (See attached document for other requirements.) (lom) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/25 6:25 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Nordstrom Inc, Wilster Apparel Group LLC. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 08/25 6:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 08/25 6:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 08/24 6:13 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 08/24 6:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 08/24 6:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/24 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/24 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18433550 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |