Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc v. J One Trading Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06375 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 12:50 AM PST |
Defendant
J One Trading Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rainbow USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Just One LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/26 8:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case30 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pso) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/24 5:53 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Thu 03/16 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Harvey I. Saferstein has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 01/23 5:14 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than (bp) |
|
27 | 27
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 01/23 3:10 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court sets the following dates: Jury Trial (Est. 3-4 days): September 19, 2017 at 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference: August 28, 2017 at 09:00 AM. Motion Cut-Off Date (last day to file): July 4, 2017.Discovery Cut-Off Date: June 20, 2017. Last day to motion the Court to add parties or amend complaint is 03/01/2017. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (ah) |
|
26 | 26
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 01/23 2:49 PM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for at 9/19/2017 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 01/16 2:47 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/07 11:19 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Just One LLC (Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 11/07 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Just One LLC, (Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/07 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Just One LLC.(Attorney Jeff D Neiderman added to party Just One LLC(pty:dft))(Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/02 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before November 9, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Just One, LLC. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 11/01 10:55 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2017. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for January 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (sw) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 10/31 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Rainbow USA Inc, (Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/31 1:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Rainbow USA Inc (Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 10/31 1:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Rainbow USA Inc.(Attorney Jeff D Neiderman added to party Rainbow USA Inc(pty:dft))(Neiderman, Jeff) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 10/12 12:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Just One LLC answer now due 10/31/2016; Rainbow USA Inc answer now due 10/31/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 10/07 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J One Trading Inc, (Ryu, Francis) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 10/07 12:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant J One Trading Inc.(Ryu, Francis) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/06 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 11, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant J. One Trading, Inc. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 10/05 3:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc, upon Defendant Rainbow USA Inc served on 9/23/2016, answer due 10/14/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brian Heitner, Partner authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 09/21 11:00 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J One Trading Inc answer now due 10/3/2016, filed by Defendant J One Trading Inc.(Attorney Francis S Ryu added to party J One Trading Inc(pty:dft))(Ryu, Francis) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 09/15 10:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc, upon Defendant J One Trading Inc served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Young Lee, Owner authorized to receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 08/30 11:18 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (cw) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/26 10:24 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants J One Trading Inc, Just One LLC, Rainbow USA Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 08/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 08/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 08/24 6:11 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 08/24 6:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 08/24 6:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/24 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/24 6:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18433576 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |