Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc v. Shosho Fashion Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-06376 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 12:58 AM PST |
Defendant
Shosho Fashion Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 06/15 9:29 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
25 | 25
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/15 9:22 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION24 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety; 2. All parties will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees incurred against one another in this action; and 3. All scheduled dates and deadlines are VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 06/13 6:23 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 03/08 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Salvatore Picariello counsel for Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc. Adding Salvatore Picariello as counsel of record for ShoSho Fashion, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ShoSho Fashion, Inc.. (Attorney Salvatore Picariello added to party Shosho Fashion Inc(pty:dft))(Picariello, Salvatore) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Fri 03/03 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) John Sommer has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Thu 12/08 10:16 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/4/17. Joint status report re settlement due by 8/11/17; no appearance necessary. (iv) |
|
20 | 20
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 12/08 10:15 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2017. Discovery cut-off 7/5/2017. Exhibit List due by 9/19/2017. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/19/2017. Motions due by 7/14/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/4/2017. Status Report due by 8/11/2017. Witness List due by 9/19/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 2:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2017 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv) |
|
Att: 1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL & TRIAL DATES | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 11/22 5:34 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/26 1:33 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Due to clerk's error, the Court hereby advances the scheduling conference from February 9, 2017 to December 9, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
17 | 17
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/26 11:55 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having received the Defendant's answer to the complaint13 , the Court hereby DISCHARGES the order to show cause dated October 11, 201611 . IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 10/25 5:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dolly M Gee. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge Gee will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8C on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 10/24 8:38 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26 (f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee is set for hearing 2/9/2017 at 9:30 AM. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 10/18 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc, (Dang, Sang) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/18 3:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc.(Dang, Sang) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Tue 10/18 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sang N Dang on behalf of Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc (Attorney Sang N Dang added to party Shosho Fashion Inc(pty:dft))(Dang, Sang) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/11 1:52 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 10/25/2016 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the defendant(s); or Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 09/19 4:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc, upon Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc served on 9/16/2016, answer due 10/7/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Pong, person authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 08/29 11:23 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/26 10:15 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Shosho Fashion Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 08/26 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 08/26 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 08/24 6:28 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 08/24 6:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 08/24 6:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/24 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/24 6:24 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18433621 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |