HAMRICK v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05176 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 21, 2017 4:08 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER AG
|
|
Defendant
BAYER CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Defendant
MERCK & CO., INC.
|
|
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME
|
|
Plaintiff
RICKY HAMRICK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Fri 10/07 2:42 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in U.S. District of Minnesota as case 0:16-cv-03177, filed 10/07/2016. (dm ) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Tue 09/20 10:15 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Minnesota. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Tue 09/20 10:16 AM
Case extracted via ECF to the District of Minnesota. (ek) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/26 11:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARPE & DOHME Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 08/26 11:39 AM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/25 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK AND CO., INC., MERCK SHARPE & DOHME ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7312802) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICKY HAMRICK.(GROSSMAN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |