Joseph M. H. LLC
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Janet S Baer |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-36356 |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2013 |
Dismissed: | May 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2014 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Joseph M. H. LLC
18 W. & 250 N. Merchants Drive
Oswego, IL 60543 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2013 2:12 PM CDT |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 09/16/2013 2:12 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 40 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1213, Filed by George Michael Vogl IV on behalf of Joseph M. H. LLC (Vogl, George) | |
2 | 2 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing of Petition and Accompanying Documents. Filed by George Michael Vogl IV on behalf of Joseph M. H. LLC. (Vogl, George) | |
3 | 3 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-36356 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24480938. Fee Amount $1213.00 (U.S. Treasury) |