F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC v. Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Helen G Berrigan |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-05983 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2013 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 29, 2014 9:50 PM CST |
Defendant
Carrier Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Kohler Rental Power, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veolia Water North America - South, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 02 2014
ORDER AND REASONS - ORDERED that within 10 days pla seek leave to file an amended complaint as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/2/2014.(kac) |