Pearlstein v. Blackberry Limited et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Referred: | Katharine H Parker |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-07060 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Sep 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 4:22 PM EST |
Defendant
Brian Bidulka
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blackberry Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thorsten Heins
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
Todd Cox & Mary Dinzik
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Omar Ahmed
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Mark Katz
|
Represented By
|
Movant
The BlackBerry Limited Investor Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Pearlstein
|
Represented By
|
1. | BlackBerry lawsuit over BlackBerry 10 revived after new information was released. (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/20/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
842 | 842
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Thu 03/02 12:29 PM
CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER granting838 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion is granted; 2. Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund will commence no later than 45 days after entry of this Order; 3. JND's determinations accepting valid claims, as indicated in Exhibits C and D of the Distribution Declaration are approved and such claims are hereby accepted; 4. JND's determinations rejecting claims, as indicated in Exhibit E of the Distribution Declaration, are approved and such claims are hereby rejected; 5. Any claims filed after February 15, 2023 are hereby barred, and JND shall not accept any additional documentation related to claims that were deficient as of February 15, 2023; 6. JND will conduct an initial distribution (the "Initial Distribution") of the Net Settlement Fund, after deducting all payments approved by the Court, and after payment of any estimated taxes, the costs of preparing appropriate tax returns, and any escrow fees, while maintaining a 10% reserve to address any tax liability and claims administration-related contingencies that may arise, as further described in the Distribution Declaration. 7. The Court adopts the following procedures for residual funds that may remain in the Net Settlement Fund, from uncashed checks or otherwise: No earlier than six (6) months from the date of the Initial Distribution any unclaimed, residual balance in the Net Settlement Fund shall be used first to pay any remaining amounts due to the Claims Administrator, then if practicable to distribute to all Claimants who have cashed their checks from the first distribution and whose proportionate share of the remaining Net Settlement Fund is $20.00 or more, after reserving for the Claims Administrator the anticipated costs of a second distribution. If any sums remain unclaimed from a second distribution and Lead Counsel determines that another distribution would be cost-effective, any unclaimed, residual balance in the Net Settlement Fund shall be distributed to all Claimants who have cashed their checks from the first distribution and whose proportionate share of the remaining Net Settlement Fund is $20.00 or more. At such time as Lead Counsel determines that further distribution is impracticable, it will propose to the Court for approval an appropriate 501 (c)(3) non-profit beneficiary; 8. All persons involved in the review, verification, calculation, tabulation, or any other aspect of the processing of the claims submitted herein, or otherwise involved in the administration or taxation of the Settlement Fund or the Net Settlement Fund, are released and discharged from any and all claims arising out of such involvement, and all Class Members, whether or not they are to receive payment from the Net Settlement Fund, are barred from making any further claim against the Net Settlement Fund or the released persons beyond the amount allocated to them pursuant to this Court's order; and 9. This Court retains jurisdiction over any further application or matter that may arise in connection with the distribution of the Net Settlement Fund. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/2/2023) (kv) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Wed 03/01 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 841 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
841 | 841
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 02/28 4:53 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Todd Cox & Mary Dinzik. Related Document Number:838 ..(Miller, Kim) |
|
840 | 840
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 02/28 4:52 PM
DECLARATION of Luiggy Segura in Support re:838 CONSENT MOTION for Disbursement of Funds .. Document filed by Todd Cox & Mary Dinzik..(Miller, Kim) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deficiency Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Email and Spreadsheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Timely Eligible Claims, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Late But Otherwise Eligible Claims, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Rejected Claims, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Invoices | ||
839 | 839
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 02/28 4:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:838 CONSENT MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . . Document filed by Todd Cox & Mary Dinzik..(Miller, Kim) |
|
838 | 838
motion
Disbursement of Funds
Tue 02/28 4:47 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . Document filed by Todd Cox & Mary Dinzik..(Miller, Kim) |