Bowen v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-14190 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 22, 2017 3:35 AM CST |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Bennie J. Bowen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/13 10:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice-originally filed as R. Doc. 18085 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 01/04/2023.(go) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Payment - Case Opening - 400 dollars
Thu 07/30 11:57 AM
Filing fee paid from Bennie J. Bowen re1 Complaint,,, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8425090)(Seeger, Christopher) |
||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Thu 10/13 11:53 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #30. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/13 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (gk) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 08/29 2:59 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/26 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Bennie J. Bowen.Attorney Christopher A. Seeger added to party Bennie J. Bowen(pty:pla).(Seeger, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Severance Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit List of case captions, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons |