MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 173.61.34.244
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Karen M Williams |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05227 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2017 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
SIGMUND KOZIERACHI
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 173.61.34.244
Terminated: 01/19/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 09/22 12:54 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Default Judgment against Sigmund Kozierachi in the amount of $13,647.00 and Permanent Injunction. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/22/2017. (dmr) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 04/27 11:24 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Sigmund Kozierachi by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A to Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/27 12:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Sigmund Kozierachi . Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 04/04 9:10 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SIGMUND KOZIERACHI for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dmr) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 04/03 9:12 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Motion for Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Motion for Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Service Member's | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/03 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. SIGMUND KOZIERACHI served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/20 9:20 AM
SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED as to SIGMUND KOZIERACHI Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DESIREE RAMSEY* (dmr) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Thu 01/19 3:34 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC as to Sigmund Kozierachi. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/19 3:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sigmund Kozierachi, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/18 11:31 AM
ORDER granting8 Second Motion For Extension of Time within which Plaintiff has to effectuate service on John Doe Defendant by 2/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/17/2017. (dmr) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 01/13 10:13 AM
Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/13 10:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/22 2:08 PM
ORDER granting4 Plaintiff's Motion seeking leave to serve a subpoena pursuant to Rule 45 prior to the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/22/2016. (tf, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/22 11:32 AM
ORDER granting5 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Within Which it Has to Effectuate Service on John Doe; Plaintiff shall have until 1/26/2017 to effectuate service of a summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/22/2016. (tf, ) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/21 4:06 PM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/21 4:10 PM
Setting Deadlines as to5 MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js) |
||
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/18 1:29 PM
MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint, by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 9 Certification of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/18 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/29 2:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (jbk, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Mon 08/29 2:19 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (jbk, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/29 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 173.61.34.244 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7316985) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(jbk, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Mon 08/29 2:20 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jbk, ) |