MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 108.35.135.174
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05229 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2017 4:52 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 108.35.135.174
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/06 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/06 2:27 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mps) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/22 2:20 PM
ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant until 1/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/22/2016. (eaj) Modified on 11/22/2016 (eaj, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/22 8:31 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/21 4:13 PM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/26 3:23 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/26/2016. (eaj) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/18 9:57 AM
MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint, by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 9 Certification of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/18 10:37 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint, . Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Mon 08/29 2:27 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/29 2:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/29 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 108.35.135.174 ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 7316562) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 3 Certification, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |