MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.199.12.36
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05237 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2017 4:48 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.199.12.36
|
|
Defendant
Nick Carnevale
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order Order of Dismissal
Mon 09/18 3:03 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. This case shall be marked closed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/18/2017. (mps) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/14 5:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Mon 08/28 9:16 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/28/2017. (jmm, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 08/09 4:04 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 8/9/2017. (if, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/27 10:16 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/9/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Mr. Cerillo is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/27/2017. (mps) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 06/27 9:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Third Party Subpoena on Optimum Online Authorizing Optimum Online to release certain subscriber information about Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/26/2017. (mps) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 06/09 6:05 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2017. (eh, ) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/20 10:31 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial Conference scheduled for 6/8/17 at 10:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been rescheduled to 9:30 a.m. (ij, ) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 03/27 2:46 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2017 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/27/2017. (km) |
|
Saturday, March 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Sat 03/04 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Nick Carnevale.(FARBER, LESLIE) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/13 2:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. Nick Carnevale served on 2/12/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/10 10:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nick Carnevale Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *PATRICK SEILER* (mps) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/25 11:17 AM
Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/25 11:56 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on Defendant . Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Thu 01/19 3:00 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC as to Nick Carnevale. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/19 3:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nick Carnevale, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/22 2:21 PM
ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant until 1/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/22/2016. (eaj) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/21 2:46 PM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/21 3:23 PM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj) |
||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/26 3:25 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/26/2016. (eaj) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/19 1:37 PM
MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint, by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 9 Certification of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/19 3:23 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference re1 Complaint, . Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Mon 08/29 3:16 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/29 3:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/29 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.199.12.36 ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 7317603) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 3 Certification, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |