Lefford v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-02240 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 31, 2016 3:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freddie Lefford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/31 5:27 PM
Notice of STIPULATION of Dismissal by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc With Prejudice .Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(aty,Gourley, Sara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: List of Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Stipulations of Dismissal | ||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
utility
Create Case Association (Docket in Member Cases)
Mon 08/29 4:02 PM
Cases associated. Create association to 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH. (crt,Brown, A) |
||
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc for MATHIS OWENS . Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:15-cv-02206-RFD-PJH(aty,Knutson, Sherry) | |
8 | 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc for ROSE SHAHEEN . Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:15-cv-02206-RFD-PJH(aty,Knutson, Sherry) | |
7 | 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc for SUSAN LOUDERMILK . Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:15-cv-02206-RFD-PJH(aty,Knutson, Sherry) | |
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs, as referenced in the Complaint of this litigation, are severed into individual lawsuits, to which individual civil action numbers have been assigned. See Attachment 1.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/4/15.(crt,Brown, A) | |
Att: 1 Attachment 1 | ||
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 LETTER TO COUNSEL from Honorable Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Brown, A) | |
4 | 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 9:15-cv-00116. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received | |
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) transferring this action to the Western District of Louisiana. (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/21/2015.] | |
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Brown, A) | ||
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) transferring this action to the Western District of Louisiana. (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/21/2015.] | |
Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Louisiana. (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/21/2015.] | ||
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-91) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. §1407 to the Western District of Louisiana for the reasons stated in the order of 12/29/2011, and with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca F Doherty. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:15-cv-02206-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A) | |
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/21/2015.] | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Houston County District Court, case number 15-0056 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5316280), filed by All Defendants.(Lilly, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/21/2015.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - E |