Dunaway v. Atlantic Law Group, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00715 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 26, 2017 4:06 AM EST |
Defendant
Atlantic Law Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer J. Dunaway
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 03/09 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Satisfaction of Judgment by Jennifer J. Dunaway re24 Clerk's Judgment (Pittman, Dale). Modified to edit docket text on 3/9/2017 (nbrow) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 02/24 4:18 PM
JUDGMENT entered by the Clerk, pursuant to Rule 68 and in accordance with the Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed 2/16/2017. Signed by Clerk of Court on 2/24/2017. (sbea, ) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Thu 02/16 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Jennifer J. Dunaway(Pittman, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Offer of Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Acceptance | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 02/15 9:28 AM
Notice of Correction re:21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The filing user has been notified that the document includes a memorandum in support as an attachment which must be filed as a separate docket entry and was directed to refile this document in CM/ECF. (nbrow) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 02/15 10:25 AM
Memorandum in Support re21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Atlantic Law Group, LLC. (Robinson, Dean). Modified to correct filing date on 2/15/2017 (nbrow) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/14 10:30 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Atlantic Law Group, LLC.(Robinson, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Mon 02/13 2:13 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on April 24, 2017 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 2/13/2017. (jsmi, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/13 9:13 AM
Settlement Conference set for 4/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. (mful) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 02/13 11:16 AM
Notice of Correction re:17 Notice. The filing user has been notified that such notice falls under discovery documents therefore, do not need to be filed unless required by the Court under Local Civil Rule 26. (nbrow) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Fri 02/10 3:22 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by the Order Setting Pretrial Conference are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Young within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference, which should occur at least thirty (30) days before the start of the trial and at such time as Magistrate Judge Young shall approve. Counsel shall abide by whatever further instructions or requirements may be imposed by Magistrate Judge Young. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 02/10/2017. (nbrow) |
|
18 | 18
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 02/10 2:24 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER SETTING Final Pretrial Conference on August 14, 2017 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial for August 29, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 2/10/17. (lcha ) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 02/10 2:07 PM
NOTICE by Atlantic Law Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Zech, Kristin) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/10 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Anne Martin Zech on behalf of Atlantic Law Group, LLC (Zech, Kristin) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 02/10 2:26 PM
Set Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (lcha ) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 02/10 3:24 PM
Case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young for Settlement Conference. (nbrow) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 02/09 3:23 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/9/2017. (lcha ) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26 Disclosure
Fri 02/03 2:27 PM
Rule 26 Disclosure by Jennifer J. Dunaway. (Pittman, Dale) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/02 2:18 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/9/2017 at 02:30 PM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (lcha ) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/30 11:42 AM
Conference Call set for 2/2/2017 at 02:00 PM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (lcha ) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/18 2:51 PM
ORDER that the Court GRANTS the Motion to Reschedule. (ECF No.9 .) E.D. Va. Loc. Civ. R. 7(G). The parties SHALL contact the Court no later than the close of business on January 20, 2017, to schedule a conference call to determine a new date. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 01/18/2017. (nbrow) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/18 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dean Domonoske on behalf of Jennifer J. Dunaway (Domonoske, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/12 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sanborn Owen on behalf of Atlantic Law Group, LLC (Owen, Amy) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 01/09 1:23 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference filed by Jennifer J. Dunaway. (Pittman, Dale) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Mon 01/09 1:22 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference by Jennifer J. Dunaway. (Pittman, Dale) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/03 11:05 AM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 11:15 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck.(lcha ) |
|
Att: 1 authorization | ||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Response Other
Mon 10/24 3:37 PM
Response to6 Reply Atlantic Law Group's Statement filed by Jennifer J. Dunaway. (Pittman, Dale) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Reply Other
Thu 10/20 9:55 AM
Reply to5 Order,, Statement in Response to Court Order filed by Atlantic Law Group, LLC. (Robinson, Dean) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 10/14 2:02 PM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS Atlantic Law Group to file a brief statement indicating whether the appearance of an Atlantic Law Group lawyer, Mr. Dean Lee Robinson, on Atlantic Law Group's behalf, adheres to the rules of professional responsibility that govern the parties' conduct before this Court. Atlantic Law Group shall file such statement within seven (7) days of entry of this Order. Plaintiff Jennifer J. Dunaway may file a responsive position within three days of service if necessary. See for complete details . It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/14/2016. (nbrow) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/29 10:22 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Atlantic Law Group, LLC.(Robinson, Dean) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/19 11:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Atlantic Law Group, LLC served on 9/9/2016, answer due 9/30/2016..(ccol, ) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/30 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Atlantic Law Group, LLC. Returned summons by mail to attorney for private process service. (ccol, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/30 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Atlantic Law Group, LLC ( Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 34683034248), filed by Jennifer J. Dunaway.. (ccol, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Receipt, | ||
Att: 5 Letter |