Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Kevin H Sharp
Referred: Joe Brown
Case #: 3:16-cv-02295
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2016
Terminated:Mar 29, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Feb 26, 2017 3:16 AM CST
Defendant
Rutherford County Board of Education
Represented By
David Randall Mantooth
Leitner, Williams, Dooley, And Napolitan (nashville)
contact info
Michael S. Holder
Leitner, Williams, Dooley, And Napolitan (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Caleb Victory
Represented By
James B. Moseley
Moseley & Moseley
contact info
Plaintiff
Lovetta Victory
Represented By
James B. Moseley
Moseley & Moseley
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 7 is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/29/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
14 14 misc Entry of Judgment Wed 03/29 4:15 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:13 Order Dismissing Case (hb)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/29 4:14 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss7 is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/29/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
12 12 order Case Management Order Wed 11/30 10:30 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: At the present time there is a pending motion to dismiss that has been briefed (Docket Entry7 ). The parties are in agreement that in order to save money it would be best to wait for a decision on that motion before undertaking expensive medical and other proof. Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge will not enter a scheduling order at this time. Upon a decision by the District Judge, if the case is not dismissed the parties will, within seven days, schedule a telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge and submit a draft scheduling order to brownchambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov, at least one business day prior to the telephone conference. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/29/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Tue 11/29 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown: Case Management Conference held on 11/29/2016. Order to enter. (Digital Audio: 29nov2016) (rd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
11 11 misc Proposed Case Management Order Tue 11/22 11:43 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Caleb Victory. (Moseley, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/14 10:14 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rutherford County Board of Education. (Mantooth, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/07 11:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caleb Victory, Lovetta Victory. (Moseley, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/28 11:50 AM
TN BAR STATUS for Attys. D. Randall Mantooth and Michael S. Holder verified as active. (hb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
8 8 15 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 09/23 4:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rutherford County Board of Education .(Mantooth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Reeves v. Besonen
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 09/23 4:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Rutherford County Board of Education. (Mantooth, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/23 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Holder on behalf of Rutherford County Board of Education (Holder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/20 8:20 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Lovetta Victory, Caleb Victory. Rutherford County Board of Education served on 9/6/2016. (Moseley, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/15 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Randall Mantooth on behalf of Rutherford County Board of Education (Mantooth, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 08/31 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (hb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/31 11:49 AM
TN BAR STATUS for Atty. James B. Moseley verified as active. (hb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
2 2 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 08/30 3:50 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (hb)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/30 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Rutherford County Board of Education (Filing fee PAID $400, Receipt number 0650-2273152), filed by Lovetta Victory, Caleb Victory. (summons issued and mailed back to counsel for service)(hb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment Summons