Lights Out Holdings, LLC v. Lights Out Apparel, LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Houston |
Referred: | Nita L Stormes |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02195 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 26, 2017 12:55 AM PST |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Zachary Kosojet
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lights Out Apparel, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lights Out Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Closing
Wed 10/04 1:44 PM
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 2,885,212, 3990916, 4242170, 4667833, 86888080, 86561783, 86561760, 85968807, re38 ORDER granting Joint Motion to Dismiss action without prejudice. cc:USPTO (mxn) |
|
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 09/15 2:40 PM
ORDER granting37 Joint Motion to Dismiss action without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/15/2017. (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/13 11:22 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action without Prejudice by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/24 10:22 AM
ORDER granting35 Joint Motion for Extension of Defendants' deadline to respond to complaint. Defendants, Lights Out Apparel, LLC, Jacob Lawson, and Zachary Kosojet, shall until and including Friday, 9/22/2017 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/24/2017. (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/23 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Thu 08/03 4:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the district judge setting aside the default and denying Plaintiff's motion for default judgment, Defendants must respond to the complaint no later than August 23, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/3/2017.(no document attached) (ecp) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
Mon 07/24 11:56 AM
ORDER (1) granting Defendants'19 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and denying Plaintiff's11 Motion for Default Judgment as Moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/21/2017. (fth) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/05 12:06 PM
STATUS REPORT by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick | ||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/24 9:21 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Mon 02/06 3:58 PM
ORDER granting29 Joint Motion to stay proceeding pending settlement negotiations.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/06/2017. (jpp) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Fri 02/03 4:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Suspend All Proceedings by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Motions Submitted
Wed 02/01 9:03 AM
ORDER Vacating Hearing. The MOTION to Set Aside Default19 and the MOTION for Default Judgment11 are taken under submission without oral argument, and the hearing set for February 6, 2017 is vacated. The Court will issue an order in due course. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/31/17.(kas) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 01/30 2:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Lights Out Apparel and Jacob Lawson filed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/25 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Zachary Kosojet, Jacob Lawson, Lights Out Apparel, LLC re25 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Berman, Steven) (jpp) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/23 2:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Lights Out Apparel and Jacob Lawson filed by Zachary Kosojet, Jacob Lawson, Lights Out Apparel, LLC.(Berman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacob Lawson | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Fri 01/13 8:10 AM
AMENDED ORDER rescheduling motion hearings. The date of January 30, 2017 set for hearing plaintiff's motion for default judgment (doc. #11 ) and defendants motion to set aside clerks entry of default (doc. #19 ) is vacated and rescheduled for February 6, 2017 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/12/2017.(jpp) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/12 3:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit to Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/11 4:29 PM
ORDER rescheduling motion hearing. The date of January 30, 2017 set for hearing plaintiff=s motion for default judgment (doc. #11 ) is vacated and rescheduled for February 6, 2017 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/11/2017.(jpp) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Fri 12/23 12:09 PM
ORDER Denying Pro Hac Vice as to Suzette M. Marteny. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/21/2016. (cc: Suzette M. Marteny)(aef) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/16 1:22 PM
ORDER Continuing Hearing Date on11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 1/30/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/16/2016.(acc) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Set Aside Default
Thu 12/15 2:43 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Zachary Kosojet, Jacob Lawson, Lights Out Apparel, LLC.(Berman, Steven)Attorney Steven Mark Berman added to party Zachary Kosojet(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Mark Berman added to party Jacob Lawson(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Mark Berman added to party Lights Out Apparel, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jacob Lawson in Support of Motion to Set Aside Clerks Default | ||
18 | 18
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/15 1:16 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9658907.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marteny, Suzette) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Fri 12/09 3:33 PM
DECLARATION re11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Lights Out Apparel and Jacob Lawson ,16 Non Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Lights Out Holdings, LLC. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Non Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/09 3:28 PM
NON Opposition re11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Lights Out Apparel and Jacob Lawson filed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 12/07 2:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Application for Default Judgment served on Lights Out Apparel, LLC and Jacob Lawson on 11/22/2016, filed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 12/05 8:41 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Zachary Kosojet. (jpp) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request for Entry of Clerk Default
Fri 12/02 4:30 PM
Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Zachary Kosojet.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick | ||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/15 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. Zachary Kosojet served. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 11/14 5:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Lights Out Apparel and Jacob Lawson by Lights Out Holdings, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 10/12 8:29 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jacob Lawson, an individual doing business as Lights Out Billiards Apparel; Lights Out Apparel, LLC.(jpp) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request for Entry of Clerk Default
Tue 10/11 1:13 PM
Request for Entry of Clerk Default against JACOB LAWSON, AN INDIVIDUAL AND DOING BUSINESS AS LIGHTS OUT BILLIARDS APPAREL AND LIGHTS OUT APPAREL, LLC.(Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kobulnick | ||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/20 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. Jacob Lawson served. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/20 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. Lights Out Apparel, LLC served. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
Wed 08/31 9:29 AM
NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Lights Out Holdings, LLC re1 Complaint, (Kobulnick, Jeffrey) (jpp) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/30 3:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (jjg) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Tue 08/30 3:28 PM
Amended REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *2,885,212*, *3990916*, *4242170*, *4667833*, *86888080*, *86561783*, *86561760*, *85968807* cc:USPTO (jjg) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/30 2:33 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jjg) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Tue 08/30 2:24 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *3990916*, *4242170*, *4667833*, *86888080*, *86561783*, *86561760*, *85968807* cc:USPTO (jjg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/30 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9368740.), filed by Lights Out Holdings, LLC. The new case number is 3:16-cv-2195-JAH-NLS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Kobulnick, Jeffrey)(jjg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |