Allister v. Rodham Clinton et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03273 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2017 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
Emily McCormick
|
|
Defendant
Donald Trump
|
|
Defendant
The State of Georgia
|
|
Defendant
The City of Roswell
|
|
Defendant
The City of Peachtree
|
|
Defendant
The City of Atlanta
|
|
Defendant
The City of Alpharetta
|
|
Defendant
Officer Shelby Sanford
|
|
Defendant
Bernie Sanders
|
|
Defendant
Roswell Police Department Group
|
|
Defendant
Roswell Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton
|
|
Defendant
Mayor Kasim Reed
|
|
Defendant
Peachtree City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Bowdre George Longo
|
|
Defendant
Officer C. T. Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Grady Memor ial Hospital
|
|
Defendant
East Point Police Department
|
|
Defendant
College Park Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Benjamin Carson
|
|
Defendant
Catherine Parrish Carpenter Andrews
|
|
Defendant
Atlanta, GA
|
|
Defendant
Atlanta Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Officer Lynn Apt
|
|
Defendant
Kevin Matthew Andrews
|
|
Defendant
Alpharetta Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Sonja M. Allister
2016 Presidential Hopeful 4669 Airport Blvd. Holiday Inn Room 318
College Park, GA 30337 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Tue 10/04 12:08 PM
ORDER denying6 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. Plaintiff has not stated a legal basis for the relief that she seeks. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/4/2016. (bdb) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 10/03 12:20 PM
Submission of6 MOTION to Reopen Case. Submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (bdb) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 10/03 12:18 PM
PRO SE MOTION to Reopen Case by Sonja M. Allister. (bdb) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 09/13 3:48 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that the case is dismissed. (bdb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 09/13 3:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/13/2016. (bdb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 09/13 3:49 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Sonja M. Allister re5 Clerk's Judgment and4 Order. (bdb) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 09/13 3:52 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) |
||
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/01 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Sonja M. Allister.(klb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 09/01 3:03 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/1/16. (klb) |
|
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/01 1:31 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (adg) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/01 3:09 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Sonja M. Allister re2 Order. (klb) |
||
utility
Submission for Frivolity
Thu 09/01 3:09 PM
Submission for Frivolity re:3 Complaint, submitted to Judge Richard W. Story. (klb) |
||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 09/01 1:30 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sonja M. Allister.(adg) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |